Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 2:24-cv-00020
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2024
Terminated:Apr 17, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 22, 2024 3:42 AM CDT
Defendant
William Lee
Represented By
Jay C. Ballard
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Meghan Murphy
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Brian Enright
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
David Rausch
Represented By
Jay C. Ballard
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Meghan Murphy
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Brian Enright
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe #50
Represented By
Eric J. Burch
Burch, Morrison & Stewart
contact info


Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Friday, September 13, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Fri 09/13 3:01 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice19 . Accordingly, pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/13/2024. (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 09/12 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Doe #50 (Burch, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 08/15 9:54 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Meghan Murphy admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/14 9:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Murphy on behalf of William Lee, David Rausch (Murphy, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
17 17 misc Status Report Mon 06/03 3:40 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by William Lee, David Rausch.(Ballard, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Proposed Agreed Order
Friday, April 19, 2024
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 04/19 8:19 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Brian Enright, Jay C. Ballard admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Administratively Closing Case Wed 04/17 4:24 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: Joint Motion to Administratively Stay Case12 is GRANTED and this case is administratively closed pending the Sixth Circuit decision. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/17/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Wed 04/17 4:22 PM
ORDER: Based on the record as a whole, the Motion for Preliminary Injunction7 is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/17/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
14 14 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/17 3:11 PM
ORDER granting11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response o1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/17/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/16 4:40 PM
NOTICE by John Doe #50 re7 Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ,8 Memorandum in Support,12 Joint MOTION to Stay Administratively Pending Ruling in Sixth Circuit Appeal Proposed Order re Preliminary Injunction (Burch, Eric)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Stay Tue 04/16 4:34 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Administratively Pending Ruling in Sixth Circuit Appeal by William Lee, David Rausch. (Enright, Brian)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/16 4:32 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by William Lee, David Rausch. (Enright, Brian)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/16 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jay C. Ballard on behalf of William Lee, David Rausch (Ballard, Jay)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/16 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Enright on behalf of William Lee, David Rausch (Enright, Brian)
Related: [-]
8 8 15 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 04/16 11:24 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of7 Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe #50 . (Burch, Eric)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 04/16 11:24 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Doe #50. (Burch, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/02 12:02 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/2/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (af)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 03/27 9:49 AM
Summons issued as to William Lee, David Rausch. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (ad) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/27/2024) (ad)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Wed 03/27 9:44 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 6/3/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ad)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Wed 03/27 9:30 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Wed 03/27 9:30 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 03/27 9:57 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Eric J. Burch admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/26 5:19 PM
COMPLAINT against William Lee, David Rausch (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4042253), filed by John Doe #50.(ad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet