Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-mj-00467
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 2:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Ethson Hugo Fonseca-Chavez (1)
Represented By
Juan Jose Becerra
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Material Witness
Jose Alexis Lopez-Sunaya
Represented By
Alya Vasquez
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Oscar Roberto Marquez-Paredes
Represented By
Alya Vasquez
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Amanda Rose McColgan
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 3:19 AM CDT
Saturday, March 23, 2024
Arrest of Ethson Hugo Fonseca-Chavez, filed. (le7)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 24, 2024
Complaint counts added: Ethson Hugo Fonseca-Chavez (1) (adg7)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Ethson Hugo Fonseca-Chavez (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 3/25/2024 at 09:01 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker (adg7)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Ethson Hugo Fonseca-Chavez. Initial Appearance set for 3/25/2024 at 09:01 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker, filed. (adg7)
Related: [-]
3 3 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Jose Alexis Lopez-Sunaya, Oscar Roberto Marquez-Paredes as to Ethson Hugo Fonseca-Chavez Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 3/25/2024 at 09:02 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker, filed. (adg7)
Related: [-]