Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00190
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 2:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Alyssa Marie Maldonado (1)
Represented By
Sandra Zamora Zayas
Asst Fed Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Brownsville
contact info
Defendant
Aaron Villarreal (2)
Represented By
Robert Louis Guerra
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Asst United States Attorney Br-Mag Duty
contact info
Zachary Hunter Blackmon
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 3:15 AM CDT
Monday, March 25, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt: INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint held on 3/25/2024 as to Alyssa Marie Maldonado, Aaron Villarreal. Defendants sworn in. Defendant's First Appearance; advised of charges and rights. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 3/28/2024 at 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. COUNSEL DETERMINATION HEARING as to Alyssa Marie Maldonado, Aaron Villarreal held. Defendants examined by U.S. Probation Office. Defendants request court appointed counsel. After review of Defendant's Financial Affidavit, the Court finds the defendants qualify for the appointment of counsel. The Court will appoint counsel to represent the Defendants. In the event the defendants are able to hire private counsel, defts shall reimburse appointed counsel for costs incurred up to such time that new counsel enters his/her appearance. Defendants held without bond. Detention Hearing set for 3/28/2024 at 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. In accordance with Rule 5(f), as amended by the Due Process Protections Act, on October 21, 2020, counsel for the United States is hereby notified of and is ordered to comply with disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny and the possible consequences of violating this order.Defendants remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances: Zachary Blackmon, AUSA; Nathan Janis, AFPD; (USPO:Eddie Guillen) (ERO:Bertha Vasquez) (Interpreter:Constanza Raber, not used) (DUSM: M Arellano) (CSO: T Arriaga) (als1)(9:45-10:17AM)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Sandra Zamora Zayas, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Alyssa Marie Maldonado, filed. (Zayas, Sandra)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Alyssa Marie Maldonado (1), Aaron Villarreal (2), filed. (bav1) (mp1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/25/2024) Unredacted attachment
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Alyssa Marie Maldonado, date of arrest: 3/24/2024., filed. (bav1) (mp1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/25/2024) Unredacted attachment
3 3 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Aaron Villarreal, date of arrest: 3/24/2024., filed. (bav1) (mp1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/25/2024) Unredacted attachment
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Federal Public Defender - Brownsville for Alyssa Marie Maldonado ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (als1)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Aaron Villarreal. Robert L. Guerra, Jr. appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (als1)
Related: [-]
6 6 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Alyssa Marie Maldonado, Aaron Villarreal ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (als1)
Related: [-]
7 7 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Alyssa Marie Maldonado, filed.
Related: [-]
8 8 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Aaron Villarreal, filed.
Related: [-]