USA v. Guimaraes
Massachusetts District Court | |
Case #: | 1:24-cr-10072 |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 3:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jordano Augusto Lima Guimaraes (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 4:06 AM EDT |
Friday, May 07, 2021 | ||
Arrest of Alessandro Felix Da Fonseca, Bruno Proencio Abreu, Edvaldo Rocha Cabral, Flavio Candido Da Silva, Jordano Augusto Lima Guimaraes, Priscila Barbosa, Guilherme Da Silveira (Quinn, Thomas) [1:21-mj-05202-JGD] | ||
Attorney update in case as to Jordano Augusto Lima Guimaraes. Attorney Gordon Spencer added. (Quinn, Thomas) [1:21-mj-05202-JGD] | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
8 | 8 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 6 Motion for Limited Unsealing of Complaint as to Priscila Barbosa (1), Edvaldo Rocha Cabral (2), Clovis Kardekis Placido (3), Guilherme Da Silveira (5), Flavio Candido Da Silva (8), Altacyr Dias Guimaraes Neto (9), Bruno Proencio Abreu (13), Jordano Augusto Lima Guimaraes (14), Alessandro Felix Da Fonseca (16) (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) [1:21-mj-05202-JGD] | |
10 | 10 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held by video conference before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein:the clerk gives notice of prohibition on broadcasting, photographing, or recording of the court proceeding; USMJ Dein conducts colloquy with Defendants. their right to a public proceeding, their right to appear in person and due to Covid-19 this video hearing was arranged; Defendants consent to proceed via video;Initial Appearance as to Flavio Candido Da Silva, Jordano Augusto Lima Guimaraes held on 5/7/2021; USMJ Dein inform the Defendants of their rights and charges; Defendants request counsel and will submit cja 23 for review; CJA attorneys Griffin and Spencer are provisionally appointed pending review of cja 23 forms; the United States is ordered to disclose all exculpatory information, in a timely manner, to the defendants; the Govt. states the maximum penalties, moves for detention and continuance; USMJ Dein orders the Dfts remanded to the custody of the US Marshal; Detention hearing for Dft. #14 Guimaraes is set for 5/11/21 @ 2:30pm and detention hearing for Dft#8 Flavio da Silva is set for 5/18/21 @ 3:00pm. (Attorneys present: Holcomb,Kearney, Griffin and Spencer. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com. Interpreter name: Claudia F. Azoff, Robert Feron Language: Portuguese. (Quinn, Thomas) [1:21-mj-05202-JGD] | |
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Monday, May 10, 2021 | ||
15 | 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jordano Augusto Lima Guimaraes This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . Detention Hearing set for 5/11/2021 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Quinn, Thomas) [1:21-mj-05202-JGD] | |
Tuesday, May 11, 2021 | ||
18 | 18 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held by video conference before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: the clerk gives notice of prohibition on broadcasting, photographing, or recording of the court proceeding; USMJ Dein conducts colloquy with Dft. of his right to a public proceeding, his right to appear in person and due to Covid-19 this video hearing was arranged; Dft. consents to proceed via video;Detention Hearing as to Jordano Augusto Lima Guimaraes held on 5/11/2021, Preliminary Hearing as to Jordano Augusto Lima Guimaraes waived on 5/11/2021; case called; Dft. submitted cja 23 form for review and CJA Attorney Spencer is appointed;Dft. waived PC hearing;Govt. withdraws motion for detention and has agreed to conditions of release; Dft. is released on 10,000.00 unsecured appearance bond with EM, Dft. shall report to probation as directed, surrender passport to probation, Do not obtain a passport or any other travel document while this case is pending,travel is restricted to the District of MA, Dft must get prior approval to work and shall not have access to personal identification data of others, Dft. shall use his true name. (Attorneys present: Holcomb,Kearney and Gordon. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Kathleen Silva at kathysilva@verizon.net. Interpreter name: Claudia F. Azoff, Language: Portuguese. (Quinn, Thomas) [1:21-mj-05202-JGD] | |
Wednesday, June 09, 2021 | ||
40 | 40
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
42 | 42 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Jordano Augusto Lima Guimaraes; Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) |