Betancourt-Colon v. Arcos Dorados Puerto Rico, LLC
Original Case: 3:21-cv-01311
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-civil-01293 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 5:46 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
ARCOS DORADOS PUERTO RICO, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
FAUSTINO XAVIER BETANCOURT-COLON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 5:46 AM EDT |
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #118) filed by Appellant Arcos Dorados Puerto Rico, LLC. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 04/09/2024. 24-1293 (AVN) | ||
Att: 1 18 pgs Abbreviated Record | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF |