Darla v. O'Malley
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Myong J Joun |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10786 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 9:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
Martin O'Malley
|
Represented By
Social Security Administration - Office of the Gen
Ssa Office Of General Counsel-Noticing contact info |
Plaintiff
Norah P Darla
on behalf of Late Dr. G.D Vivek Sagar
77 Hano Street, MA 02134 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/12 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amy C. Bland on behalf of Martin O'Malley (Bland, Amy) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Procedural Order re Social Security Action
Fri 04/05 11:49 AM
Judge Myong J. Joun: ORDER entered. Procedural Order re Social Security Action The court transmits this action to the Commissioner of the appropriate office within the Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and to the United States Attorney for this district, through this NEF, under Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security. (York, Steve) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/05 11:17 AM
Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (PSSA, 4) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Wed 03/27 9:56 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Myong J. Joun assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Kinsella, Jaylannie) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice for Social Security and Immigration Cases
Wed 03/27 9:04 AM
Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Castilla, Francis) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/27 9:01 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Norah P Darla.(Castilla, Francis) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/27 9:00 AM
COMPLAINT against Martin O'Malley, filed by Norah P Darla.(Castilla, Francis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Category |