Evans et al v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | James S Moody, Jr |
Referred: | Anthony E Porcelli |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00762 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 11:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Ava Evans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Evans, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 04/12 2:51 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 16 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to May 10, 2024 to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 4/12/2024. (SMB) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Fri 04/12 11:02 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Burgess, Robert) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Thu 04/11 12:01 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/31/2024; Dispositive motions due by 1/31/2025; Pretrial Conference is set for THURSDAY, DECEMBER 11, 2025, at 9:30 A.M. in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Jury Trial is set on the JANUARY 2026 trial term set for 1/5/2026 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/17/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 4/11/2024. (SMB) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Case Management Report
Wed 04/10 2:41 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Bavaro, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/04 11:38 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Carrington Holding Company, LLC for Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC.. (Burgess, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/03 8:51 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 6 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Amended by Ava Evans, Chris Evans, Sr.. (Bavaro, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of appearance
Tue 04/02 11:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel James Pasky on behalf of Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC (Pasky, Daniel) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of appearance
Tue 04/02 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Burgess on behalf of Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC (Burgess, Robert) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/01 9:11 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 6 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Ava Evans, Chris Evans, Sr. (Bavaro, Matthew) Modified text on 4/1/2024 (SET) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons returned executed
Mon 04/01 8:54 AM
RETURN of service executed on 3/29/2024 by Ava Evans, Chris Evans, Sr. as to Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC.(Bavaro, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Executed Summons | ||
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 03/29 3:00 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 03/29 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons issued
Thu 03/28 11:14 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (ARL) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/27 4:02 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:24-cv-762-JSM-AEP. (TNP) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Wed 03/27 11:20 AM
NOTICE of a related action None per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Ava Evans, Chris Evans, Sr.. Related case(s): No (Bavaro, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 03/27 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Matthew David Bavaro on behalf of Ava Evans, Chris Evans, Sr.. Lead Counsel: Matthew D. Bavaro. (Bavaro, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/27 10:40 AM
COMPLAINT against Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21915228) filed by Ava Evans, Chris Evans, Sr..(Bavaro, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 11 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons |