District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Randolph D Moss
Case #: 1:24-cv-00876
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause05:0701 Judicial Review of Agency Decision
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 23, 2024 4:17 AM EDT
Defendant
MARK FOUST
Represented By
Alexa V. Penalosa
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
DEB HAALAND
Represented By
Alexa V. Penalosa
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
MYRNA PALFREY
Represented By
Alexa V. Penalosa
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
CHARLES F. SAMS, III
Represented By
Alexa V. Penalosa
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE
Represented By
Alexa V. Penalosa
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED
Represented By
Eduardo S. Garcia
Stein Sperling Bennett De Jong Driscoll
contact info
Yonaton Aronoff
Harris St. Laurent & Wechsler LLP
contact info
Addy R. Schmitt
Harris St. Laurent & Wechsler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
47 47 motion Miscellaneous Relief Leave to File Document Mon 05/12 6:26 PM
MOTION : Plaintiffs Motion to Govern Proceedings and for Leave to File Amended Complaint re Order on Motion to Vacate,,, Order on Motion to Modify,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, , MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED.(Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Govern Proceedings and for Leave to File Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Proposed First Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 to Proposed Amended Complaint Decl. of C. Pedrolie,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 to Proposed Amended Complaint Decl. of A. Salicrup,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 - Redline Comparison of Proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 - Unofficial English Translation of ECF No. 44-3,
Att: 7 Proposed Order
Friday, March 28, 2025
46 46 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Fri 03/28 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED. Attorney Yonaton Aronoff and Addy R. Schmitt terminated. (Schmitt, Addy)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Vacate Order on Motion to Modify Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/28 9:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Motion to Vacate, Dkt.45 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Plaintiff shall file a motion to govern further proceedings or, alternatively, inform Federal Defendants and the Court that it does not intend to do so on or before May 12, 2025. It is further ORDERED that the March 28, 2025 deadline to file a joint appendix is VACATED and RESET for fourteen days after Plaintiff files its motion, and the hearing currently set for April 16, 2025 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/28/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
45 45 motion Vacate Thu 03/27 9:15 PM
Joint MOTION to Vacate by UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, CHARLES F. SAMS, III, MARK FOUST, DEB HAALAND, MYRNA PALFREY.(Penalosa, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
44 44 misc Administrative Record Thu 03/27 6:41 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Supplement by UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, CHARLES F. SAMS, III, MARK FOUST, DEB HAALAND, MYRNA PALFREY.(Penalosa, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
Friday, March 21, 2025
43 43 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Fri 03/21 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED (Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/21 12:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before March 28, 2025, the parties shall file on the docket a joint appendix containing all the materials in the Administrative Record cited by Plaintiff or Defendants in their summary judgment briefing. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/21/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
order Order on Motion to Continue Set/Reset Hearings Tue 03/04 9:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Unopposed Motion to Continue, Dkt.42 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED in part and that the motions hearing currently set for April 7, 2025, is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for April 16, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/4/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
42 42 motion Continue Fri 02/28 4:19 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue by UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE.(Penalosa, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
41 41 motion Continue Wed 02/26 6:32 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re Order, Set Hearings by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED.(Seby, Paul) Modified on 2/27/2025 to correct relief (zjm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Hearing
40 40 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/26 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Tieslau on behalf of ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED (Tieslau, Matthew)
Related: [-]
39 39 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/26 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Martin Seby on behalf of ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED (Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/26 9:03 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice 37 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Paul Martin Seby is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice 38 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Matthew Kallop Tieslau is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a)/LCrR 44.5(a). Click for Instructions . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/26/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Hearing Set/Reset Hearings Wed 02/26 7:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion to Reschedule Hearing, Dkt.41 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The hearing currently set for March 7, 2025, is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for April 7, 2025, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 8. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/26/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
38 38 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/25 11:46 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew Kallop Tieslau, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11500476. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED.(Waeckerlin, Eric) Modified docket text on 2/25/2025 (mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration for Pro Hac Vice Admission
Monday, February 24, 2025
37 37 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/24 5:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul Martin Seby, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11500600. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED.(Waeckerlin, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration for Pro Hac Vice Admission
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 02/04 4:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a hearing on the cross-motions for summary judgment, Dkt.25 , Dkt.27 , on Friday, March 7, 2025, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/4/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
35 35 respm Surreply Fri 01/31 1:29 PM
SURREPLY to re33 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Penalosa, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/28 11:29 AM
NOTICE (Joint) Regarding the Administrative Record by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED (Schmitt, Addy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
36 36 respm Surreply Mon 02/03 12:17 PM
SURREPLY to re27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zjm)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 01/24 10:11 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply, Dkt.33 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and the surreply attached thereto DEEMED FILED. It is further ORDERED that on or before January 31, 2025, Defendants may file a sur-surreply not to exceed six pages. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/24/2025. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of QC **DO NOT USE- FOR REPORTING PURPOSES ONLY.** Fri 01/24 12:20 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re33 Motion for Leave to File; emailed to aschmitt@hs-law.com, cc'd 7 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following for future filings; do not refile document , 2. DO NOT REFILE. Counsel is reminded that log in and password should match signature page. (zjm, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
33 33 motion Leave to File Document Thu 01/23 7:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED.(Schmitt, Addy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Saturday, January 18, 2025
32 32 misc Transcript Sat 01/18 7:53 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on August 22, 2024; Page Numbers: 1-22. Date of Issuance:January 18, 2025. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sonja L. Reeves, RDR-CRR, Telephone number (202) 354-3246, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/8/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2025 Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, Sonja
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
31 31 respm Reply to opposition to motion Tue 01/14 7:48 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re25 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Penalosa, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
30 30 respm Reply to opposition to motion Tue 12/10 6:44 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re25 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED.(Aronoff, Yonaton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Charlene Pedrolie,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Billie J. Burton,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Ritta Volovich,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Coryn Julien,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Ana Maria Salicrup,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Karla Colom
29 29 respm Response to motion Tue 12/10 6:43 PM
RESPONSE re27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED.(Aronoff, Yonaton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Charlene Pedrolie,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Billie J. Burton,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Ritta Volovich,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Coryn Julien,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Ana Maria Salicrup,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Karla Colom
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
28 28 respm Response to motion Tue 11/05 7:48 PM
RESPONSE re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, CHARLES F. SAMS, III, MARK FOUST, DEB HAALAND, MYRNA PALFREY. (Penalosa, Alexa)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Summary Judgment Tue 11/05 7:46 PM
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, CHARLES F. SAMS, III, MARK FOUST, DEB HAALAND, MYRNA PALFREY.(Penalosa, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, October 04, 2024
26 26 respm Supplemental Memorandum Fri 10/04 2:26 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment Corrected Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment filed by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED. (Aronoff, Yonaton)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Summary Judgment Fri 10/04 11:52 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED.(Aronoff, Yonaton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, September 13, 2024
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/13 9:39 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by MARK FOUST, DEB HAALAND, MYRNA PALFREY, CHARLES F. SAMS, III, UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE.(Penalosa, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 09/05 5:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, Dkt.23 , it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, Dkt.22 , is DEEMED WITHDRAWN. It is further ORDERED that the following schedule is adopted: October 4, 2024: Deadline for Plaintiff to file a motion for summary judgment. November 5, 2024: Deadline for Defendants to file a response and cross-motion for summary judgment. December 10, 2024: Deadline for Plaintiff to file reply in support of its motion and response to Defendants' cross-motion. January 14, 2025: Deadline for Defendants to file reply in support of its cross-motion. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/5/2024. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
23 23 misc Status Report Wed 09/04 11:11 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE.(Penalosa, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, August 22, 2024
minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 08/22 3:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Scheduling Conference held. Joint Status Report due by 9/4/2024. Defendants' Response due on or before 9/6/2024; Plaintiffs Reply due on or before 9/13/2024. Defendant's oral motion to extend time to answer the complaint is GRANTED. Answer is due on or before 9/13/24. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8- In Person before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (Court Reporter Sonja Reeves) (zglw)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
22 22 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Mon 08/19 10:22 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED.(Aronoff, Yonaton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of Yonaton Aronoff, Esq.,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - NPS_0000174,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - NPS_0000251,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 - NPS_0003126,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 - NPS_0003616,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt of NPS_0001436,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 - NPS_0002576,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7 - NPS_0000305,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8 - NPS_0001236,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9 - Emails with Counsel,
Att: 12 Exhibit 10 - Request For Quotation,
Att: 13 Text of Proposed Order
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 08/19 1:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Dkt.22 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a scheduling conference on Thursday, August 22, 2024 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 8 to discuss a timeline for briefing and resolving this motion. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/19/2024. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 07/31 1:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER: On May 31, 2024, the Court stayed Defendants' deadline to file an answer to the Complaint pending resolution of the motion to transfer. The Court denied the motion to transfer on July 27, 2024. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants file an Answer on or before August 30, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/31/24. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 27, 2024
21 21 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Sat 07/27 4:50 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons explained herein, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' motion to transfer, Dkt.16 , is DENIED. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/27/24. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
20 20 respm Reply to opposition to motion Mon 07/15 5:17 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re16 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by MARK FOUST, DEB HAALAND, MYRNA PALFREY, CHARLES F. SAMS, III, UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Penalosa, Alexa)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/15 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Filing of the Certified Index of Administrative Record by MARK FOUST, DEB HAALAND, MYRNA PALFREY, CHARLES F. SAMS, III, UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE (Penalosa, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
18 18 15 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Mon 07/01 11:33 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re16 Motion to Transfer Case filed by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED. (Schmitt, Addy)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Briefing Schedule Fri 05/31 8:55 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply , Unopposed MOTION for Briefing Schedule by MARK FOUST, DEB HAALAND, MYRNA PALFREY, CHARLES F. SAMS, III, UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE. (Penalosa, Alexa)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/31 10:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Answer Deadline and for Enlargement of Time, Dkt.17 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that (1) Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is STAYED pending resolution of the motion to transfer; (2) Defendants shall file a certified list of the contents of the Administrative Record on or before July 15, 2024; (3) Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' motion to transfer on or before July 1, 2024; and (4) Defendants shall reply in support of their motion to transfer on or before July 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/31/24. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
16 16 motion Transfer Case Thu 05/30 6:30 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case by MARK FOUST, DEB HAALAND, MYRNA PALFREY, CHARLES F. SAMS, III, UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE.(Penalosa, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Wed 04/24 1:31 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General April 1, 2024.(Schmitt, Addy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of Delivery
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Wed 04/24 1:28 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARK FOUST served on 4/12/2024(Schmitt, Addy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Return Receipt
Monday, April 15, 2024
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Mon 04/15 11:48 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/3/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/2/2024.(Schmitt, Addy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mailing,
Att: 2 Exhibit Return Receipt
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Mon 04/15 10:17 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEB HAALAND served on 4/1/2024(Schmitt, Addy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Return Receipt
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Mon 04/15 10:15 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MYRNA PALFREY served on 4/2/2024(Schmitt, Addy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Return Receipt
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Mon 04/15 10:12 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHARLES F. SAMS, III served on 4/8/2024(Schmitt, Addy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Return Receipt
Thursday, April 11, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/11 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa V. Penalosa on behalf of All Defendants (Penalosa, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/02 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Yonaton Aronoff on behalf of ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED (Aronoff, Yonaton)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
7 7 order .Order Fri 03/29 11:05 AM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/29/24. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/29 11:11 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice 3 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Yonaton Aronoff is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a)/LCrR 44.5(a). Click for Instructions . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/29/24. (lcrdm2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/28 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eduardo S. Garcia on behalf of ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED (Garcia, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 03/28 10:26 AM
SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
4 4 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Thu 03/28 9:28 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED (Schmitt, Addy)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/28 10:22 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/27 4:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Yonaton Aronoff, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10785169. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED.(Schmitt, Addy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Yonaton Aronoff,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
2 2 misc Errata Wed 03/27 2:18 PM
ERRATA by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED re1 Complaint,,,,.(Schmitt, Addy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Errata Complaint
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/27 11:55 AM
COMPLAINT against MARK FOUST, DEB HAALAND, MYRNA PALFREY, CHARLES F. SAMS, III, UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10783772) filed by ALLEY CAT ALLIES INCORPORATED.(Schmitt, Addy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - San Juan National Historic Site Free-Ranging Cat Management Plan Public Scoping Correspondences,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - NPS's Free-Ranging Cat Management Plan Environmental Assessment,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Free-Ranging Cat Management Plan Public Scoping Newsletter,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Finding of No Significant Impact Free-Ranging Cat Management Plan,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Management of Feral and Free-Ranging Cat Populations to Reduce Threats to Human Health and Safety and Impacts to Native Wildlife Species In the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Summons United States National Park Service,
Att: 8 Summons Charles F. Sams III,
Att: 9 Summons Mark Foust,
Att: 10 Summons Deb Haaland,
Att: 11 Summons Myrna Palfrey,
Att: 12 Summons U.S. Attorney General,
Att: 13 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C.
notice Notice of Error- New Case Wed 03/27 12:48 PM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint. The following error(s) need correction: Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file a Notice of Errata stating the error and attach the corrected initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party and file using the event Errata. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmw)
Related: [-]