McDaniel v. ReliaStar Life Insurance Company
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Eric C Tostrud |
Referred: | John F Docherty |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01074 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 11:11 AM CDT |
Defendant
ReliaStar Life Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Christopher McDaniel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 04/26 8:54 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christopher McDaniel. ReliaStar Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/22/2024, answer due 6/21/2024. (Phomtalikhith, Pounnaphone) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/28 9:06 AM
Summons Issued as to ReliaStar Life Insurance Company. (BTX) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 03/28 9:02 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 24-cv-1074 (ECT/JFD). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (BTX) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/27 10:13 AM
COMPLAINT against ReliaStar Life Insurance Company (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10933044) filed by Christopher McDaniel. Filer requests summons issued. (Phomtalikhith, Pounnaphone) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |