Highland Group, LLC
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Cecelia G Morris |
Case #: | 4:24-bk-35296 |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Highland Group, LLC
60 Jon Barrett Rd
Patterson, NY 12563-2164 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee 11A Clinton Ave. Room 620
Albany, NY 12207 |
Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Affidavit
Tue 04/30 3:24 PM
Affidavit of Brett Wallace in connection with Amended Schedules Filed by Gerard R. Luckman on behalf of Highland Group, LLC. (Luckman, Gerard) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Amended Schedules
Tue 04/30 3:03 PM
Amended Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Amended Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Gerard R. Luckman on behalf of Highland Group, LLC. (Luckman, Gerard) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Tue 04/30 3:05 PM
Receipt of Amended Schedules([LINK 24-35296 cgm] ) [misc,schaja] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16606002. Fee amount 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice, Appearance
Wed 04/24 9:18 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Paul W Carey on behalf of Vistalab Technologies, Inc.. (Carey, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Application, Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 11:00 AM
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Paul W. Carey signed on 4/23/2024. (Kinchen, Gwen) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/22 11:40 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Presentment of Debtor's Application for Retention Filed by Gerard R. Luckman on behalf of Highland Group, LLC. (Luckman, Gerard) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
11
pgs
motion
Application, Employ
Fri 04/19 3:15 PM
Application to Employ Forchelli Deegan Terrana LLP as Attorney for Chapter 11 Debtor filed by Gerard R. Luckman on behalf of Highland Group, LLC Responses due by 5/10/2024, with presentment to be held on 5/14/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM). (Luckman, Gerard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice, Appearance
Thu 04/18 11:54 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Leslie Ann Berkoff on behalf of Vistalab Technologies, Inc.. (Berkoff, Leslie) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission
Thu 04/18 11:49 AM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Paul W. Carey, filed by Leslie Ann Berkoff on behalf of Vistalab Technologies, Inc.. (Berkoff, Leslie) |
|
Att: 1 (Proposed) Order | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 04/18 11:51 AM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 24-35296 cgm] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16592576. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing
Wed 04/17 11:35 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing re: Case Conference held and adjourned to 6/4/2024 at 09:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (DuBois, Linda) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice, Appearance
Thu 04/11 4:16 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Mark G. Ledwin on behalf of Putnam County Dept. of Finance. (Ledwin, Mark) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice, Appearance
Thu 04/11 4:15 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Marc J. Gross on behalf of Putnam County Dept. of Finance. (Gross, Marc) |
|
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Thu 04/11 3:48 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated: Deficiencies satisfied. (Kinchen, Gwen) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Resolution Pursuant to LR 1074-1
Wed 04/10 11:42 AM
Corporate Resolution Pursuant to LR 1074-1 Filed by Gerard R. Luckman on behalf of Highland Group, LLC. (Luckman, Gerard) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Meeting of Creditors
Mon 04/08 4:48 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors Instructions for Telephonic Section 341(a) Meeting of Creditors filed by Alicia M. Leonhard on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/1/2024 at 12:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Leonhard, Alicia) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting
Fri 04/05 12:10 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors . Notice Date 04/04/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/03 11:52 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Entry of Order Filed by Gerard R. Luckman on behalf of Highland Group, LLC. (Luckman, Gerard) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Appearance
Tue 04/02 5:17 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Documents filed by Erica Feynman Aisner on behalf of AKT Three Realty LLC.(Aisner, Erica) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
4 | 4
misc
341(a) Notice (Chapter 11) (BNC)
Tue 04/02 11:27 AM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/1/2024 at 12:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (DuBois, Linda) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/01 12:40 PM
Order Signed on 4/1/2024 Scheduling Case Conference With Hearing To Be Held On 4/16/2024 at 09:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (Kinchen, Gwen) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
misc
Set Deficiency Deadlines
Thu 03/28 8:43 AM
Deficiencies Set: Corporate Resolution due 4/10/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 4/10/2024, (DuBois, Linda) |
||
misc
Add Judge
Thu 03/28 8:43 AM
Judge Cecelia G. Morris added to the case. (DuBois, Linda) |
||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2
Wed 03/27 1:33 PM
Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 of Brett Wallace in Connection With Chapter 11 Case Filed by Gerard R. Luckman on behalf of Highland Group, LLC. (Luckman, Gerard) |
|
1 | 1
31
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 03/27 1:15 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Highland Group, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 7/25/2024, Disclosure Statement due by 7/25/2024, Initial Case Conference due by 4/26/2024, Filed by Gerard R. Luckman of Forchelli Deegan Terrana on behalf of Highland Group, LLC. (Luckman, Gerard) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 03/27 1:19 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-35296 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16566665. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |