Kusay et al v. Kinsale Insurance Company
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John E Steele |
Referred: | Nicholas P Mizell |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00274 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 20th Judicial Circuit Court for Lee County, 2024CA001039 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Kinsale Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lizabeth Kusay
|
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Mannes
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/25 3:48 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement UNDER RULE 7.1, FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, AND LOCAL RULE 3.03 by Lizabeth Kusay, Patrick Mannes. (McDonough, Edward) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 04/25 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward McDonough on behalf of Lizabeth Kusay, Patrick Mannes. Lead Counsel: Edward J. McDonough. (McDonough, Edward) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order directing compliance
Thu 04/25 11:03 AM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs certified that they are familiar with and will abide by the local rules and orders entered in this action. (Doc. 14 ). And last week, the court advised that Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement using the standard form from the clerk or the court's website. (Doc. 11). Yet, plaintiffs have failed to comply, thereby defying the local rules and a court order. By May 2, 2024, plaintiffs must file their disclosure statement using the standard form, which can be found at: https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/form/disclosure-statement, or show cause why they should not be sanctioned for noncompliance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/25/2024. (JMM) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Exception
Tue 04/23 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Exception by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Saunders, Xavier) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of compliance
Fri 04/19 4:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of compliance JOINT CERTIFICATION OF FAMILIARITY WITH LOCAL RULES AND ORDERS by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Saunders, Xavier) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 04/18 6:10 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Xavier T. Saunders on behalf of Kinsale Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Xavier T. Saunders. (Saunders, Xavier) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/18 6:09 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 11 Order directing compliance by Kinsale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Kinsale Capital Group for Kinsale Insurance Company. (Saunders, Xavier) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order directing compliance
Thu 04/18 10:09 AM
TEXT ORDER: Local Rule 3.03 requires that, with the first appearance, each party must file a disclosure statement using the standard form from the clerk or the court's website. The parties failed to do so. By April 24, 2024, the parties must file their disclosure statement using the standard form, which can be found at: https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/form/disclosure-statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/18/2024. (JMM) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order directing compliance
Thu 04/18 9:57 AM
TEXT ORDER. The Hurricane Ian Scheduling Order (Doc. 5 ) requires a joint certification that the parties are familiar with and will abide by the court's local rules and orders entered as of the certification date. The parties failed to file a certification by the required date. They must promptly file the certification, or , by April 24, 2024, they must show cause why they should not be sanctioned for neither participating in the filing of the joint notice nor seeking any relief from the certification requirement. The parties are reminded that the hurricane scheduling order conveniently includes a table summarizing all deadlines. (Doc. 5 at 17-18). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/18/2024. (JMM) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 04/16 4:49 PM
Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Saunders, Xavier) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss / Failure to State a Claim
Tue 04/09 10:41 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/9/2024. (RKR) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 04/03 4:08 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Saunders, Xavier) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Protective Order
Fri 03/29 1:33 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 3/29/2024.(WRW) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
5 | 5
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Fri 03/29 1:32 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: (HURRICANE IAN) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 3/29/2024. (WRW) |
|
4 | 4
order
Civil Action Order
Fri 03/29 1:31 PM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/29/2024. (WRW) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/28 10:24 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Kinsale Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Lizabeth Kusay, Patrick Mannes. (originally filed in state court of 2/5/2024)(LAB) Modified text on 3/28/2024 (LAB) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/27 3:47 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:24-cv-274-JES-NPM. (AA) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/27 1:51 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $405, receipt number CFLMDC-21916483 filed by Kinsale Insurance Company.(Saunders, Xavier) |
|
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents Composite Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |