Onken v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Hala Y Jarbou |
Referred: | Sally J Berens |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00320 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 2:09 PM EDT |
defendant
Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
|
|
plaintiff
Nathan Onken
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Case Management Order
Mon 04/15 10:25 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: administrative record due to plaintiff by 6/7/2024; defendant to e-file administrative record by 7/5/2024; plaintiff's brief on the merits due 7/5/2024; defendant's brief on the merits due 8/2/2024; plaintiff's reply due 8/16/2024; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 11:59 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Cook, William) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/12 10:41 AM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Cook, William) Modified text on 4/12/2024 (ns) |
|
notice
Attorney Appearance
Fri 04/12 10:46 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of William S. Cook on behalf of defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Cook, William) |
||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Fri 04/12 10:47 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joshua Bachrach on behalf of defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Bachrach, Joshua) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/10 8:07 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024 (Busta, Donald) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/28 8:27 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (ns) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Thu 03/28 8:26 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hala Y. Jarbou (ns) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Proposed Summons (to be issued)
Wed 03/27 1:57 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Busta, Donald) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/27 1:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company filed by Nathan Onken (Busta, Donald) |
|
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Wed 03/27 1:58 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Nathan Onken in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7331671 (Busta, Donald) |