Jeffrey G Lashmet v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01475 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 23, 2024 4:49 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Co
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Ciba, Inc 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey G Lashmet
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jeffrey G Lashmet WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-01475-RMG(McMurtray, Patrick) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 04/01 3:45 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 3/27/2024), Jeffrey G Lashmet v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-01475-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Southern California (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11673849.), filed by Jeffrey G Lashmet. Service due by 6/25/2024(sshe, ) |