MBMBA LLC
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Sean H Lane |
Case #: | 7:24-bk-22255 |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
MBMBA LLC
6 Charlotte Pl
Spring Valley, NY 10977-3831 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Motion, Relief from Stay (fee)
Mon 04/22 3:52 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay Re: 6 Charlotte Place, Spring Valley, NY 10977 filed by Melissa N. Licker on behalf of TVC Funding IV, LLC with hearing to be held on 5/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom (SHL) Responses due by 5/16/2024,. (Licker, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Hearing | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law | ||
Att: 3 Rule 55 Declaration | ||
Att: 4 Order | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Loan Documents | ||
Att: 6 Supplemental Declaration in Support | ||
Att: 7 Debtor's Schedule A | ||
Att: 8 Relief from Stay Worksheet | ||
Att: 9 Certification of Service | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 04/22 5:34 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay (fee)([LINK 24-22255 shl] ) [motion,185] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16596542. Fee amount 199.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
trustee
Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors
Thu 04/18 10:36 AM
Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Filed by Paul Kenan Schwartzberg on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/2/2024 at 02:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Schwartzberg, Paul) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Thu 04/11 4:16 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated . (Rai, Narotam) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2
Wed 04/10 3:04 PM
Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 Filed by Allen A. Kolber on behalf of MBMBA LLC. (Kolber, Allen) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Schedules
Wed 04/10 2:09 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Allen A. Kolber on behalf of MBMBA LLC. (Kolber, Allen) |
|
Saturday, March 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting
Sun 03/31 12:10 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors . Notice Date 03/30/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 03/29 4:26 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Melissa N. Licker on behalf of TVC Funding IV, LLC. (Licker, Melissa) |
|
4 | 4
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 03/29 11:37 AM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Conference Signed On 3/29/2024, With hearing to be held on 5/14/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Ebanks, Liza) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter
Thu 03/28 9:17 AM
Letter Dial-In Instructions for 341 Meeting of Creditors Filed by Paul Kenan Schwartzberg on behalf of United States Trustee. with hearing to be held on 4/25/2024 at 01:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s (Schwartzberg, Paul) |
|
2 | 2
misc
341(a) Notice (Chapter 11) (BNC)
Thu 03/28 8:46 AM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/25/2024 at 01:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Vargas, Ana) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 03/28 8:55 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-22255 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16567668. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 03/27 2:46 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due 04/10/2024. Schedule A/B due 04/10/2024. Schedule D due 04/10/2024. Schedule E/F due 04/10/2024. Schedule G due 04/10/2024. Schedule H due 04/10/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 04/10/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/10/2024. Atty Disclosure State. due 04/10/2024. Declaration of Schedules due 04/10/2024. Bankruptcy Petition Preparer Notice, Declaration and Signature Form 119 due 04/10/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 04/10/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 04/10/2024, Chapter 11 Plan due by 7/25/2024, Disclosure Statement due by 7/25/2024, Initial Case Conference due by 4/26/2024, Filed by Allen A. Kolber of Law Offices of Allen A. Kolber, Esq. on behalf of MBMBA LLC. (Kolber, Allen) |
|
misc
Add Judge
Wed 03/27 3:09 PM
Judge Sean H. Lane added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Wed 03/27 3:15 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
misc
Set Deficiency Deadlines
Wed 03/27 3:17 PM
Deficiencies Set: Schedule A/B due 4/10/2024. Schedule D due 4/10/2024. Schedule E/F due 4/10/2024. Schedule G due 4/10/2024. Schedule H due 4/10/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 4/10/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/10/2024. Declaration of Schedules due 4/10/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/10/2024. Corporate Resolution DUE at Time of Filing. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit DUE at Time of Filing. Incomplete Filings due by 4/10/2024, (Porter, Minnie) |