Ally Bank v. Louis
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Nathaniel M Gorton |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10791 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 15:1601 Truth in Lending |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Brockton District Court, 2415cv0223 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 3:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Phylicia D Louis
7 Christy Dr #2
Brockton, MA 02301 |
|
Plaintiff
Ally Bank
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Copy Mailed
Wed 04/24 3:22 PM
Copy re10 Order of Remand ,11 Order of Remand to the State Court mailed to Phylicia Louis on 4/24/2024. (Warnock, Douglas) Modified docket text on 4/24/2024 (Warnock, Douglas) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Case file sent
Wed 04/24 3:11 PM
Case file sent to Brockton District Court. (Warnock, Douglas) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order of Remand to State Court
Wed 04/24 2:56 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to the State Court (Warnock, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
4
pgs
order
Order of Remand to State Court
Wed 04/24 12:55 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to the State Court. The Clerk is directed to enter an order of remand immediately, promptly notify the Brockton District Court in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c), and close this action. The Clerk shall terminate the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis as moot.(PSSA, 3) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/19 11:57 AM
Opposition to6 Motion to Enlarge/Dismiss and Complaint for Default Judgment filed by Phylicia D Louis.(Kelly, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Copy Mailed
Wed 04/17 9:58 AM
Copy of 7 Electronic Order and docket sheet mailed to Phylicia D Louis on 4/17/2024. (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 04/17 9:56 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Enlarge time to file a Motion to Dismiss. (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 04/16 11:38 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Enlarge time to file a Motion to Dismiss by Ally Bank.(Lushan, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Wed 03/27 4:39 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Kinsella, Jaylannie) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/27 3:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Phylicia D Louis.(Castilla, Francis) ( |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 03/27 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Special deposit Ally Bank, by Phylicia D Louis re1 Notice of Removal, (Castilla, Francis) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 03/27 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Special appearance by Phylicia D Louis re1 Notice of Removal, (Castilla, Francis) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/27 3:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Phylicia D Louis from Brockton District Court, case number 2415cv0223.(Castilla, Francis) (Castilla, Francis) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement of removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Category form | ||
Att: 3 (3/27/2024) Supplement of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal |