Coleman v. Lynds
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine A Robertson |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-30043 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 04/11 3:44 PM
Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting Assented to7 MOTION to Enlarge the Time to Answer the Petition for Habeas Corpus. The deadline for the respondent to respond to the petition is extended to May 20, 2024 . (Rivera, Melissa) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 04/09 4:33 PM
NOTICE by Joann Lynds regarding existence of victim (Badway, Eva) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 04/09 4:28 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 20, 2024 to Answer the Petition for Habeas Corpus by Joann Lynds.(Badway, Eva) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eva M. Badway on behalf of Joann Lynds (Badway, Eva) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Copy Mailed
Fri 03/29 11:20 AM
Copy re3 Amended Complaint,4 Service Order - 2254 Petition, mailed to Respondent Lynds and Attorney General's office on 3/29/2024. (Zamorski, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
order
Service Order-2254 Petition
Fri 03/29 9:36 AM
Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/Responsive pleading due within 21 days of receipt of this order. (Rivera, Melissa) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 03/28 10:38 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Joann Lynds, filed by Wayland X Coleman.(Goldblatt, Dana) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/28 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254
Wed 03/27 2:59 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number AMADC-10337312 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Wayland X Coleman.(Goldblatt, Dana) |
|
Att: 1 Category Form, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |