Connecticut District Court
Judge:Sarah F Russell
Referred: Thomas O Farrish
Case #: 3:24-cv-00469
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 23, 2024 4:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Aware Recovery Care of Massachusetts, LLC
Represented By
David R. Golder
Jackson Lewis - P.C. Htfd, Ct
contact info
Donald J Anderson, III
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Aware Recovery Care, Inc.
Represented By
David R. Golder
Jackson Lewis - P.C. Htfd, Ct
contact info
Donald J Anderson, III
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dorothea Cornick
Represented By
Chelsea K. Choi
Connor & Morneau, LLP
contact info
Nicholas R. Conlon
Brown, LLC
contact info
Jeffrey S. Morneau
Connor & Morneau, LLP
contact info
Jason T. Brown
Brown, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, March 21, 2025
49 49 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 03/21 3:59 PM
ORDER granting48 Motion for Extension of Time. The stay of this action shall extend until May 5, 2025. Signed by Judge Sarah F. Russell on 3/21/2025. (McDonough, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
48 48 3 pgs motion Extension of Time Thu 03/20 10:27 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until May 5, 2025 for Stay of Litigation Proceedings 47 Order, by Aware Recovery Care of Massachusetts, LLC, Aware Recovery Care, Inc.. (Golder, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
47 47 order Order Tue 03/18 10:40 AM
ORDER. The court notes that the stay of this action expired on February 28, 2025. See ECF No. 45 . If the parties seek further time to engage in settlement negotiations, they shall file a joint motion for extension of the stay on or before March 28, 2025. If the parties do not agree on whether a stay is warranted, they shall file a joint notice on the same date describing the positions of the parties as to a stay. Signed by Judge Sarah F. Russell on 3/18/2025. (McDonough, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
46 46 order Order of Transfer Tue 01/07 9:45 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah F. Russell for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 1/7/2025.(Hushin, Z.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
45 45 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 12/20 12:29 PM
ORDER granting44 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until February 28, 2025 to Extend Stay of All Proceedings and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/20/2024. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
44 44 4 pgs motion Extension of Time Thu 12/19 10:43 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until February 28, 2025 to Extend Stay of All Proceedings and Deadlines 42 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Aware Recovery Care, Inc., Aware Recovery Care of Massachusetts, LLC.(Golder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, November 08, 2024
43 43 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/08 11:15 AM
NOTICE by Dorothea Cornick of filing consent to join forms(Celiesius, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
42 42 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 10/15 8:22 PM
ORDER granting #41 Joint Motion for Extension of Time until December 28, 2024 to extend stay of all proceedings and deadlines. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/15/2024. (Mejia-Cruz, D.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
41 41 motion Extension of Time Mon 09/30 8:36 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until December 28, 2024 to extend stay of all proceedings and deadlines by Aware Recovery Care of Massachusetts, LLC, Aware Recovery Care, Inc..(Anderson, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
40 40 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/07 1:17 PM
NOTICE by Dorothea Cornick of filing consent to join forms(Celiesius, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Consent to Join Forms
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
39 39 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/06 3:58 PM
NOTICE by Dorothea Cornick of filing consent to join forms(Celiesius, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Consent to Join
Monday, August 05, 2024
38 38 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 08/05 6:14 PM
ORDER granting37 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until September 30, 2024 to extend stay of all proceedings and deadlines. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/5/2024. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
37 37 motion Extension of Time Fri 08/02 12:36 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until September 30, 2024 to extend stay of all proceedings and deadlines by Dorothea Cornick.(Brown, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/03 9:47 AM
NOTICE by Dorothea Cornick of filing consent to join forms(Celiesius, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A-Consent to Join Forms
Thursday, May 23, 2024
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/23 5:00 PM
NOTICE by Dorothea Cornick(Conlon, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit Consent to Join
Friday, May 17, 2024
34 34 order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 05/17 12:22 PM
ORDER granting Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation Proceedings (Doc. #33 ). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/17/2024. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
33 33 motion Stay Thu 05/16 4:48 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation Proceedings by Aware Recovery Care of Massachusetts, LLC, Aware Recovery Care, Inc..Responses due by 6/6/2024(Golder, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
32 32 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/14 8:54 AM
ORDER granting30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason T. Brown.. Signed by Clerk on 5/14/2024. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/14 8:53 AM
ORDER granting29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edmund C. Celiesius.. Signed by Clerk on 5/14/2024. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
30 30 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/13 8:57 AM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Jason T. Brown to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Dorothea Cornick.(Morneau, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Court Admissions,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
29 29 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/13 8:54 AM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Edmund C. Celiesius to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Dorothea Cornick.(Morneau, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Court Admissions,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, May 09, 2024
28 28 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/09 1:09 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edmund Charles Celiesius and denying27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason T. Brown. Motions do not comply with LR 83.1 (e)(1)(b).. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/9/2024. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
27 27 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/08 2:09 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Jason T. Brown to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7754220) by Dorothea Cornick.(Morneau, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
26 26 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/08 2:03 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Edmund Charles Celiesius to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7754170) by Dorothea Cornick.(Morneau, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Friday, April 26, 2024
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/26 3:49 PM
NOTICE by Dorothea Cornick of filing consent to join forms(Conlon, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Consent to Join Forms
Monday, April 22, 2024
24 24 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 04/22 9:24 PM
ORDER granting22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 23, 2024 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint2 Complaint,1 Complaint,. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/22/2024. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 04/22 4:03 PM
Disclosure Statement by Aware Recovery Care of Massachusetts, LLC, Aware Recovery Care, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Aware Recovery Care, Inc. for Aware Recovery Care of Massachusetts, LLC. (Golder, David)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Mon 04/22 9:27 PM
Answer deadline updated for Aware Recovery Care of Massachusetts, LLC to 5/23/2024; Aware Recovery Care, Inc. to 5/23/2024. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time Thu 04/18 11:14 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 23, 2024 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint2 Complaint,1 Complaint, by Aware Recovery Care of Massachusetts, LLC, Aware Recovery Care, Inc.. (Golder, David)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/18 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Donald J Anderson, III on behalf of Aware Recovery Care of Massachusetts, LLC, Aware Recovery Care, Inc. (Anderson, Donald)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/18 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Golder on behalf of Aware Recovery Care of Massachusetts, LLC, Aware Recovery Care, Inc. (Golder, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/17 5:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorothea Cornick. Aware Recovery Care, Inc. served on 4/2/2024, answer due 4/23/2024. (Conlon, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/11 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas R. Conlon on behalf of Dorothea Cornick (Conlon, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/11 11:10 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas Conlon.. Signed by Clerk on 4/11/2024. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
16 16 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/10 3:32 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas Conlon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7718161) by Dorothea Cornick.(Morneau, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Court Admissions,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/10 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Morneau on behalf of Dorothea Cornick (Morneau, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/10 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea K. Choi on behalf of Dorothea Cornick (Choi, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/04 2:21 PM
NOTICE by Dorothea Cornick of filing consent to join forms(Conlon, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Consent to Join Forms
Friday, March 29, 2024
12 12 service Electronic Summons Reissued Fri 03/29 1:36 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Aware Recovery Care, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nicholas R. Conlon* *Brown, LLC* *111 Town Square Place, Suite 400* *Jersey City, NJ 07310*. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Electronic Summons Reissued Fri 03/29 1:34 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Aware Recovery Care of Massachusetts, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nicholas R. Conlon* *Brown, LLC* *111 Town Square Place, Suite 400* *Jersey City, NJ 07310*. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 03/29 9:30 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Aware Recovery Care, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nicholas R. Conlon* *JTB Law Group, LLC* *155 2nd St., Suite 4* *Jersey City, NJ 07302*. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 03/29 9:29 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Aware Recovery Care of Massachusetts, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nicholas R. Conlon* *JTB Law Group, LLC* *155 2nd St., Suite 4* *Jersey City, NJ 07302*. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Electronic Service Documents Fri 03/29 9:27 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,2 Complaint, filed by Dorothea Cornick,1 Complaint, filed by Dorothea Cornick,5 Electronic Filing Order,6 Standing Protective Order, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Signed by Clerk on 3/29/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
service Request to Issue Summons Thu 03/28 3:47 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Aware Recovery Care of Massachusetts, LLC, Aware Recovery Care, Inc.. (Perez, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
7 7 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Fri 03/29 9:25 AM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Fri 03/29 9:24 AM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/27/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Electronic Filing Order Fri 03/29 9:23 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/27/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Fri 03/29 9:22 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/26/2024 Discovery due by 9/26/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2024 Signed by Clerk on 3/27/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 03/28 3:12 PM
CORRECTED COMPLAINT against Aware Recovery Care of Massachusetts, LLC, Aware Recovery Care, Inc. ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7698405.), filed by Dorothea Cornick.(Perez, J.) Modified on 3/28/2024 to add payment information (Perez, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1: Consent to Sue,
Att: 3 Summons For Aware Recovery Care Inc.,
Att: 4 Summons For Aware Recovery Care Massachusetts, LLC
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/27 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Aware Recovery Care of Massachusetts, LLC, Aware Recovery Care, Inc. ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7698405.), filed by Dorothea Cornick.(Conlon, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1: Consent to Sue,
Att: 3 Summons For Aware Recovery Care Inc.,
Att: 4 2 pgs Summons For Aware Recovery Care Massachusetts, LLC
notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Thu 03/28 3:46 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 3/27/2024.(Perez, J.)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 03/28 4:22 PM
Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]