Cabozzi v. Anna Jaques Hospital
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Indira Talwani |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10792 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Essex Superior Court, 2477CV00068 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 4:07 PM EDT |
Defendant
Anna Jaques Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Cabozzi
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/24 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Laukaitis on behalf of Gary Cabozzi (Laukaitis, Kevin) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Wed 04/24 12:30 PM
Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kevin Laukaitis. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account] . (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 10:54 AM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kevin Laukaitis Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10382439 by Gary Cabozzi (Kelly, Danielle). (Main Document 13 replaced on 4/24/2024) (Kelly, Danielle). Modified on 4/24/2024: Removed certificate from main document to properly file as an attachment (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 (4/24/2024) Certificate of Kevin Laukaitis | ||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathalie Anne Freeman on behalf of Anna Jaques Hospital (Freeman, Nathalie) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. McAndrew on behalf of Anna Jaques Hospital (McAndrew, Edward) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
State Court Record - no answer filed in state court
Tue 04/16 3:35 PM
STATE COURT Record. (Gil, Lindsey) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Mon 04/08 9:08 AM
Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER allowing 8 Assented to Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Edward J. McAndrew and Nathalie A. Freeman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/05 2:38 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Edward J. McAndrew and Nathalie A. Freeman Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number AMADC-10353386 by Anna Jaques Hospital.(Gil, Lindsey) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Edward J. McAndrew, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Nathalie A. Freeman | ||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/03 11:43 AM
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
6 | 6
3
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 04/03 8:54 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to May 20, 2024 to File Answer to Class Action Complaint by Anna Jaques Hospital.(Gil, Lindsey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/28 3:01 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anna Jaques Hospital. (Gil, Lindsey) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel
Thu 03/28 11:04 AM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Horvath, Courtney) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Thu 03/28 10:18 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/27 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey A. Gil on behalf of Anna Jaques Hospital (Gil, Lindsey) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/27 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anna Jaques Hospital ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10337597 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Gil, Lindsey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Action Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Category Form |