Sullivan v. American Institute of Mind Body Medicine, Inc. et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Denise J Casper |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10793 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 5:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
American Institute of Mind Body Medicine, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kimberly D'Eramo, D.O.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Sullivan
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/09 10:26 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. American Institute of Mind Body Medicine, Inc. served on 4/5/2024 (Wurster, Christopher) Modified docket text on 4/9/2024 (Cook, Savannah) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/09 10:23 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Kimberly D'Eramo served on 4/5/2024 (Wurster, Christopher) Modified docket text on 4/9/2024 (Cook, Savannah) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 1:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed (Wurster, Christopher) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/08 1:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed (Wurster, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/04 10:34 AM
Summons Issued as to American Institute of Mind Body Medicine, Inc., Kimberly D'Eramo, D.O.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Horvath, Courtney) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter/request - non-motion
Wed 04/03 12:57 PM
Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiff's Counsel Requesting Summonses to be Issued . (Wurster, Christopher) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/03 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Wurster on behalf of Jessica Sullivan (Wurster, Christopher) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/03 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Beth R. Myers on behalf of Jessica Sullivan (Myers, Beth) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/28 3:54 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Institute of Mind Body Medicine, Inc., Kimberly D'Eramo, D.O.. (Peters, Kevin) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel
Thu 03/28 11:05 AM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Horvath, Courtney) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/28 11:03 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Institute of Mind Body Medicine, Inc.. (Peters, Kevin) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Thu 03/28 10:27 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Exhibit
Thu 03/28 9:31 AM
EXHIBIT re1 Notice of Removal, by American Institute of Mind Body Medicine, Inc., Kimberly D'Eramo, D.O.. (Peters, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/27 5:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Institute of Mind Body Medicine, Inc., Kimberly D'Eramo, D.O. ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10337865 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Peters, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 CIvil Action Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Form |