Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Travis R Mcdonough
Referred: Christopher H Steger
Case #: 1:24-cv-00130
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2024
Terminated:Sep 19, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 23, 2024 4:47 AM EDT
Defendant
William Lee
Represented By
Lorrie Nicole Lamberth
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Peako Andrea Jenkins
State Of Tennessee, Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
David B. Rausch
Represented By
Lorrie Nicole Lamberth
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Peako Andrea Jenkins
State Of Tennessee, Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe #054
Represented By
Eric J Burch
Eric J. Burch
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, September 19, 2024
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 09/19 9:40 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Case Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by John Doe #054. (Burch, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
21 21 order Status Report Order Wed 09/18 6:28 PM
ORDER. Status Report due by 9/25/2024 .Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on September 18, 2024. (SAC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 09/12 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice by John Doe #054 (Burch, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/27 7:37 AM
ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS that this case remain STAYED until September 20, 2024. On or before 9/20/2024 , the parties SHALL file a joint status report notifying the Court of any resolution or proposal for resuming litigation, including a request for a scheduling conference. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/27/2024. (DCB)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
18 18 misc Status Report Mon 06/03 12:36 PM
STATUS REPORT by William Lee, David B. Rausch. (Jenkins, Peako)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Deficiency (PDF) Wed 04/17 3:07 PM
INFORMATIONAL NOTICE of Deficiency (PDF) as to William Lee, David B. Rausch. (AWS)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Wed 04/17 12:04 PM
NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by William Lee, David B. Rausch (Jenkins, Peako) (Main Document 16 replaced on 4/17/2024 to print to PDF). (AWS)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Wed 04/17 8:06 AM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 4/17/2024. (AWS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Consent Form
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/16 5:21 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by William Lee, David B. Rausch.(Jenkins, Peako)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Tue 04/16 2:56 PM
ORDER The Court will GRANT each motion 7 , 8 , 10 . Defendants are hereby ENJOINED from enforcing the Act against Plaintiff. The Court will GRANT Defendants' motion to stay the case 7 and will set the trial date and deadlines in this case following the Sixth Circuit's ruling. Until then, this matter is hereby STAYED. Defendants request "an extension until 14 days after this Court rules on the pending joint motion to stay. 8 , at 1. For good cause, the motion (id.) is GRANTED. Defendants must respond to the complaint within fourteen days of this order's entry. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 4/16/2024. (AWS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/15 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lorrie Nicole Lamberth on behalf of All Defendants (Lamberth, Lorrie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
11 11 15 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 04/11 9:17 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re7 Joint MOTION to Stay ,10 Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe #054. (Burch, Eric)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Preliminary Injunction Thu 04/11 9:16 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Doe #054. (Burch, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/10 8:07 PM
ORDER granting 8 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. A motion to stay this case is pending. Defendants' response to the complaint shall be filed after the stay is lifted, assuming a stay is granted, or 14 days after the motion to stay is denied. This entry is the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 4-10-24. (KMG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/09 1:56 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by William Lee, David B. Rausch. (Jenkins, Peako)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Stay Tue 04/09 1:55 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by William Lee, David B. Rausch. (Jenkins, Peako)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/09 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peako Andrea Jenkins on behalf of All Defendants (Jenkins, Peako)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
5 5 5 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Thu 03/28 9:09 AM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 3/28/24. (ABF)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Thu 03/28 9:09 AM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 3/28/24. (ABF)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Thu 03/28 9:08 AM
Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 3/28/24. (ABF)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 03/28 9:07 AM
Summons Issued as to William Lee, David B. Rausch.(ABF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons William Lee
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 03/28 9:03 AM
District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/27 2:47 PM
COMPLAINT against William Lee, David B. Rausch ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5634492.), filed by John Doe #054.(Burch, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons - William Lee,
Att: 3 Summons Summons - David Rausch