Iowa Northern District Court
Judge:Leonard T Strand
Case #: 3:24-cv-03017
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2024
Terminated:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Monday Sep 23, 2024 3:19 AM CDT
Defendant
Allied Lube Iowa LLC
Represented By
Anne E Updegraff
Mwh Law Group LLP
contact info
Julie Tomka Bittner
Mwh Law Group LLP
contact info
Kerrie M Murphy
Mwh Law Group LLP
contact info
Taylor Sellers
Mwh Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Hunter Isebrand
Represented By
Anne E Updegraff
Mwh Law Group LLP
contact info
Julie Tomka Bittner
Mwh Law Group LLP
contact info
Kerrie M Murphy
Mwh Law Group LLP
contact info
Taylor Sellers
Mwh Law Group
contact info
Samuel Luke Craven
Whitfield & Eddy, PLC
contact info
Defendant
James C Jensen
Represented By
Anne E Updegraff
Mwh Law Group LLP
contact info
Julie Tomka Bittner
Mwh Law Group LLP
contact info
Kerrie M Murphy
Mwh Law Group LLP
contact info
Taylor Sellers
Mwh Law Group
contact info
Samuel Luke Craven
Whitfield & Eddy, PLC
contact info
Defendant
Premium Velocity Auto LLC
Represented By
Samuel Luke Craven
Whitfield & Eddy, PLC
contact info
Anna Elizabeth Mallen
Whitfield & Eddy
contact info
Defendant
Phoenix Shelton
Represented By
Anne E Updegraff
Mwh Law Group LLP
contact info
Julie Tomka Bittner
Mwh Law Group LLP
contact info
Kerrie M Murphy
Mwh Law Group LLP
contact info
Taylor Sellers
Mwh Law Group
contact info
Samuel Luke Craven
Whitfield & Eddy, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Abigail Hamill-Wilson
Represented By
Thomas J Duff
Duff Law Firm PLC
contact info
Nathan Vos
contact info
Plaintiff
Heather Lange
Represented By
Thomas J Duff
Duff Law Firm PLC
contact info
Nathan Vos
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 03/10 9:55 AM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to25 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (mmc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 03/07 4:48 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (JOINT) by Heather Lange. (Duff, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 12/09 3:02 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice For Plaintiff Abigail Hamill-Wilson ONLY by Abigail Hamill-Wilson. (Duff, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
23 23 order Protective Order Mon 09/30 11:21 AM
PROTECTIVE Order granting22 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 9/30/2024. (jag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
22 22 motion Protective Order Thu 09/26 11:36 AM
JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiffs Abigail Hamill-Wilson, Heather Lange. (Duff, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
21 21 order Trial Management Order Thu 09/26 11:21 AM
TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/18/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2025 03:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing before Judge Leonard T Strand. Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2025 08:30 AM in Ctrm 3 (3rd Floor) Sioux City before Judge Leonard T Strand. Jury Trial set for 11/3/2025 09:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (3rd Floor) Sioux City before Judge Leonard T Strand. Signed by Judge Leonard T Strand on 9/26/2024. (jag)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
20 20 order Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Fri 09/20 9:21 AM
SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 9/11/2024 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 10/28/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 10/28/2024. Plaintiffs' Expert Witness due by 12/2/2024. Defendants' Expert Witnesses due by 2/28/2025. Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Experts due by 3/28/2025. Discovery due by 4/28/2025. Motions due by 5/28/2025. Trial Ready Deadline 10/28/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 9/19/2024. (jag)
Related: [-]
19 19 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 09/20 9:18 AM
MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/19/2024. Official Court Record: FTR Gold. (jag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
18 18 misc Corporate/Citizenship Disclosure Statement Thu 09/19 10:32 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Premium Velocity Auto LLC identifying Corporate Parent Shell Petroleum Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Corporate Parent Jiffy Lube International, Inc., Corporate Parent Pennzoil-Quaker State Company dba SOPUS Products, a Delaware Corporation, Corporate Parent Shell USA, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Corporate Parent Shell Group Holding Limited, Corporate Parent Shell plc, a United Kingdom public limited company for Premium Velocity Auto LLC. (Craven, Samuel)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/19 9:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kerrie M Murphy on behalf of Allied Lube Iowa LLC, Hunter Isebrand, James C Jensen, Phoenix Shelton. (Murphy, Kerrie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/10 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Sellers on behalf of Allied Lube Iowa LLC, Hunter Isebrand, James C Jensen, Phoenix Shelton. (Sellers, Taylor)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 09/10 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Defendants Allied Lube Iowa LLC, Hunter Isebrand, James C Jensen, Phoenix Shelton. (Updegraff, Anne) Modified text and changed to a Notice per MAR chambers on 9/10/2024 (kms)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
14 14 misc Corporate/Citizenship Disclosure Statement Mon 09/09 2:02 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Allied Lube Iowa LLC identifying no corporate parents or affiliates. (Bittner, Julie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
13 13 order Hearings (Setting/Resetting) Thu 09/05 3:53 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2024 01:30 PM in Telephonic Hearing before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. See Order for Court's Zoom.Gov audio instructions. Failure to appear for this scheduling conference could result in sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 9/5/2024. (jag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
utility Case Reassigned Thu 08/29 8:21 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned to the case as presider. Motions referred to Mark A Roberts. No conflicts identified. (ksy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
12 12 motion Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Wed 08/28 11:38 AM
PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Plaintiffs Abigail Hamill-Wilson, Heather Lange. (Duff, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 08/21 3:35 PM
ORDER: The parties' deadline to file their Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan has passed. The parties shall file their Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by 8/28/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 8/21/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/15 9:42 AM
ANSWER With Jury Demand to1 Complaint by Hunter Isebrand, James C Jensen, Premium Velocity Auto LLC, Phoenix Shelton.(Craven, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
utility Set/Reset Corporate/Citizenship Disclosure Deadlines Mon 08/12 9:40 AM
Set Deadline: Defendant Allied Lube Iowa LCC LR 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/9/2024. (jag)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/09 4:00 PM
ANSWER With Jury Demand to1 Complaint by Allied Lube Iowa LLC, Hunter Isebrand, James C Jensen, Phoenix Shelton.(Updegraff, Anne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 06/13 8:11 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Heather Lange, Abigail Hamill-Wilson. Allied Lube Iowa LLC waiver sent on 6/12/2024, answer due 8/12/2024. (Duff, Thomas)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 06/13 8:09 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Heather Lange, Abigail Hamill-Wilson. Hunter Isebrand waiver sent on 6/12/2024, answer due 8/12/2024; James C Jensen waiver sent on 6/12/2024, answer due 8/12/2024; Premium Velocity Auto LLC waiver sent on 6/12/2024, answer due 8/12/2024; Phoenix Shelton waiver sent on 6/12/2024, answer due 8/12/2024. (Duff, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
6 6 service Acknowledgment of Service Tue 06/11 3:44 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed for Individual Defendants Jensen, Shelton & Isebrand Acknowledgement filed by Abigail Hamill-Wilson, Heather Lange. (Duff, Thomas)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Acknowledgment of Service Tue 06/11 3:42 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed for Defendant Allied Lube Iowa LLC Acknowledgement filed by Abigail Hamill-Wilson, Heather Lange. (Duff, Thomas)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Acknowledgment of Service Tue 06/11 3:41 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed for Defendant Premium Velocity Auto LLC Acknowledgement filed by Abigail Hamill-Wilson, Heather Lange. (Duff, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
3 3 notice Notice - MJ Case Assignment Thu 03/28 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 6/26/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 03/28 9:50 AM
Summons Issued as to Allied Lube Iowa LLC, Hunter Isebrand, James C Jensen, Premium Velocity Auto LLC, Phoenix Shelton ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (jlh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 New Civil Case Packet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 03/28 9:36 AM
Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (SchedRpt) Wed 03/27 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIANDC-4131015.), filed by Heather Lange, Abigail Hamill-Wilson. Scheduling Report due by 6/25/2024 (Duff, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exh. 1 - Wilson ICRC Complaint,
Att: 2 Exh. 2 - Lange ICRC Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet