Jeannite v. Hickey et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Richard G Stearns |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10796 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 6:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Matthew Hickey
|
|
Defendant
Col. John Mawn
|
|
Plaintiff
Joel Jeannite
1756 Dorchester Ave
Dorchester, MA 02124 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 04/26 5:02 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Joel Jeannite (McManus, Caetlin) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Copy Mailed
Wed 04/10 2:59 PM
Copy one ECF# 4 and 5 mailed to Joel Jeannite 1756 Dorchester Ave Dorchester, MA 02124 on 4-10-24. (Castilla, Francis) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 04/10 12:43 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 4) |
|
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/10 12:42 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice. (PSSA, 4) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Thu 03/28 8:55 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/27 5:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joel Jeannite.(Phillips, Sophie) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/27 5:30 PM
COMPLAINT against John Mawn, Matthew Hickey, filed by Joel Jeannite.(Phillips, Sophie) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Form |