Vargo et al v. EVO Transportation & Energy Services, Inc. et al
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | David H Urias |
Referred: | Laura Fashing |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00301 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Case in other court: | First Judicial District Court, D-101-CV-24-00451 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 6:09 PM MDT |
Defendant
EVO Services Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EVO Transportation & Energy Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Candice Cooke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Diener
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Gutierrez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Vargo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Damian Vasquez
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 01 2024
ORDER for Further Rule 7.1 Disclosure by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Defendants shall file their Rule 7.1 statement by 4/22/24. (lj) |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge David H. Urias as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
10 | 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EVO Services Group, LLC, EVO Transportation & Energy Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EVO Services Group, LLC for EVO Services Group, LLC; Corporate Parent EVO Transportation & Energy Services, Inc. for EVO Transportation & Energy Services, Inc.. (Loman, Eric) | |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9302410 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Anthony Gutierrez, Candice Cooke, Damian Vasquez, Steven Vargo, David Diener (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kaufman, Justin) | ||
ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Steven Vargo by Justin Ross Kaufman on behalf of: Douglas M. Werman Werman Salas P.C. 77 W. Washington, Suite 1402 Chicago, IL 60602 312-419-1008 dwerman@flsalaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Kaufman, Justin) | ||
ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Steven Vargo by Justin Ross Kaufman on behalf of: John Frawley Werman Salas P.C. 77 W. Washington, Suite 1402 Chicago, IL 60602 312-419-1008 jfrawley@flsalaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Kaufman, Justin) | ||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by EVO Services Group, LLC, EVO Transportation & Energy Services, Inc.. (Loman, Eric) | |
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9299143 re1 Notice of Removal, filed by EVO Transportation & Energy Services, Inc., EVO Services Group, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Loman, Eric) | ||
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE by Steven Vargo Of Good Standing (Kaufman, Justin) | |
ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Candice Cooke, David Diener, Anthony Gutierrez, Steven Vargo, Damian Vasquez by Douglas Werman (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Werman, Douglas) | ||
Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9292238 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Anthony Gutierrez, Candice Cooke, Damian Vasquez, Steven Vargo, David Diener (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kaufman, Justin) | ||
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 2 pgs ORDER for Further Rule 7.1 Disclosure by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Defendants shall file their Rule 7.1 statement by 4/22/24. (lj) | |
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 2 pgs INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/16/2024 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 5/9/2024. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 4/18/2024. (lj) | |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EVO Transportation & Energy Services, Inc., EVO Services Group, LLC from New Mexico First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2024-00451. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by EVO Transportation & Energy Services, Inc., EVO Services Group, LLC.(Loman, Eric) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (eh) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) |