Berg v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Washington Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Stanley A Bastian |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00097 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 5:07 PM PDT |
Defendant
The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Berg
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Fri 04/26 5:18 PM
DECLARATION by Kristina N. Holmstrom in Support re11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Kristina N. Holmstrom. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4537401. filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Buhite, Russell) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Fri 04/26 5:17 PM
DECLARATION by Russell S. Buhite in Support re11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Kristina N. Holmstrom. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4537401. filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Buhite, Russell) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/26 5:16 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Kristina N. Holmstrom. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4537401. by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Buhite, Russell) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Scheduling Conference Notice
Tue 04/23 10:40 AM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 5/31/2024 at 11:00 AM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 7:44 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Buhite, Russell) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/22 7:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Relief by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Buhite, Russell) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/22 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Scott Buhite on behalf of The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Attorney Russell Scott Buhite added to party The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Buhite, Russell) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Robert J. Rosati by Robert J Rosati on behalf of Barbara Berg (Rosati, Robert) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/08 10:16 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint on Defendant The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company filed by Barbara Berg. (Crawford, Melton) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/08 10:08 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) Plaintiff's Motion on Behalf of Attorney Robert Rosati to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ECF No.3 , is GRANTED. Robert Rosati is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Plaintiff's local counsel of record, Mel Crawford, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A. Bastian (TNC, Case Administrator) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/28 7:57 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Robert Rosati. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4514559. by Barbara Berg. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2024 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Crawford, Melton) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/27 5:14 PM
Summons Issued as to The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (TNC, Case Administrator) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/27 3:49 PM
COMPLAINT For Declaratory Relief against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 405; Receipt # AWAEDC-4514346) Filed by Barbara Berg.(Crawford, Melton) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 03/27 5:11 PM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (TNC, Case Administrator) |