Canfield et al v. Grant County Sheriffs Office et al
Washington Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas O Rice |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00098 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Grant County Superior Court, 22-00002-00777-13 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 5:08 PM PDT |
Defendant
Grant County
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Grant County Sheriffs Office
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tom Jones
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ryan Rectenwald
Grant County Sheriff's Office 35 C. Street NW
Ephrata, WA 98823 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dustin Canfield
Mary Schultz Law P.S. 2111 E. RED BARN LN
Spangle, WA 99031 |
|
Plaintiff
Darrik Gregg
Mary Schultz Law P.S. Mary Schultz Law P.S. 2111 E. RED BARN LN
Spangle, WA 99031 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Fri 04/26 4:28 PM
DECLARATION by Mary Schultz in Support re3 MOTION to Remand or Abstain filed by All Plaintiffs.(Schultz, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Complaint), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Answer, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C Motion dismissal, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D Stipulation, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E Order dismissal, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F Judgment, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G Depositions, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H Answers Disc, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I Second Tort Claim, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J Second Amended TC, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K email depos | ||
3 | 3
motion
Remand
Fri 04/26 4:17 PM
MOTION to Remand or Abstain by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Schultz, Mary) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/22 11:40 AM
Amended ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by All Defendants.(Warring, Carl) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Thu 03/28 9:19 AM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (TNC, Case Administrator) |
||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/27 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $405; Receipt #AWAEDC-4514417 Filed by All Defendants.(Warring, Carl) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit R, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit S, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit T, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit U |