FMCI, LLC
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher J Panos |
Case #: | 4:24-bk-40292 |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 05, 2024 |
Debtor
FMCI, LLC
400 Grafton St
Shrewsbury, MA 01545-4013 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King
Office of US. Trustee 446 Main Street 14th Floor
Worcester, MA 01608 |
|
Trustee
Jack E. Houghton
78 Bartlett Avenue
Pittsfield, MA 01201 |
Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 12:08 AM EDT |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
none
Wed 03/27 1:19 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-40292 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt Number A20411620, amount $ 338.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Wed 03/27 1:16 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals All Schedules and Statements and Matrix. Filing Fee in the Amount of $338 Filed by FMCI, LLC. (Baldiga, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Wed 03/27 1:22 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Joseph H. Baldiga in the amount of $15,000.00. Plus $338.00 paid to debtor`s counsel for court filing fees filed by Debtor FMCI, LLC (Baldiga, Joseph) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors 7b(Assets) (Use For Auto Assign Only)
Wed 03/27 4:02 PM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled on 4/24/2024 at 01:00 PM as a Telephonic Meeting. Government proof of claim due by 9/23/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 6/5/2024. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) |