Fancy Paws Training, Inc.
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Thomas M Lynch |
Case #: | 3:24-bk-80391 |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Debtor
Fancy Paws Training, Inc.
2040 Brittany Bend
Lake in the Hills, IL 60156 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
James E Stevens
Barrick, Switzer, Long, Balsley & Van Ev 6833 Stalter Drive
Rockford, IL 61108 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 780 Regent St. Suite 304
Madison, WI 53715 |
Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 12:03 AM CDT |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a)
Wed 03/27 3:28 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $338, Filed by David Freydin on behalf of Fancy Paws Training, Inc. (Freydin, David) |
|
Att: 1 Signature Pages | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 03/27 3:30 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-80391 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47697592. Fee Amount $ 338.00 (Freydin, David) (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Asset Corporation)
Wed 03/27 4:11 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/23/2024 at 10:30 AM via Zoom - Stevens: Meeting ID 230 268 2554, Passcode 0085661781, Phone 1-815-697-5605. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) |