Hines v. Denver et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Gordon P Gallagher |
Referred: | Michael E Hegarty |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00845 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 22, 2024 2:25 AM MDT |
Defendant
City and County of Denver
|
|
Defendant
Star Motel
|
|
Defendant
Anthony Bova
|
|
Defendant
N. Reid
|
|
Defendant
Emment Hurd
|
|
Defendant
Deryck De Araujo
|
|
Defendant
Christopher Cochran
|
|
Plaintiff
Dontae Hines
PO Box 472421
Aurora, CO 80047 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Denver Police Department
Terminated: 06/17/2024
|
|
Defendant
Denver Health
Terminated: 06/17/2024
|
|
Defendant
Denver
Terminated: 06/17/2024
|
|
Defendant
County of Denver
Terminated: 06/17/2024
|
|
Defendant
City of Denver
Terminated: 06/03/2024
|
Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM MDT |
Thursday, May 22, 2025 | ||
108 | 108
order
Memorandum
Thu 05/22 4:22 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding107 MOTION to Strike103 Response,80 MOTION to Dismiss,79 MOTION to Dismiss,104 Response filed by Emment Hurd, City and County of Denver, Deryck De Araujo, Anthony Bova, Christopher Cochran. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 05/22/2025. Text Only Entry (dclem) |
|
107 | 107
![]() MOTION to Strike103 Response,80 MOTION to Dismiss,79 MOTION to Dismiss,104 Response by Defendants Christopher Cochran, Anthony Bova, City and County of Denver, Emment Hurd, Deryck De Araujo. (Murphy, David) |
|
106 | 106
![]() RESPONSE to102 MOTION for Judgment filed by Defendants Christopher Cochran, Anthony Bova, City and County of Denver, Emment Hurd, Deryck De Araujo. (Murphy, David) |