New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00177
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Mar 28, 2024 3:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Edward Eustate Jimenez (1)
Represented By
David Touger
Peluso & Touger
contact info
Defendant
Willianyi Almanzar Polanco (2)
Represented By
Lisa Scolari
Law Office Of Lisa Scolari
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Adam Sasan Sowlati
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 4:44 AM EDT
Monday, February 26, 2024
Arrest of Edward Eustate Jimenez, Willianyi Almanzar Polanco. (job) [1:24-mj-00851-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Willianyi Almanzar Polanco. Attorney Lisa Scolari for Willianyi Almanzar Polanco added. (job) [1:24-mj-00851-UA]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Edward Eustate Jimenez. Attorney David Touger for Edward Eustate Jimenez added. (job) [1:24-mj-00851-UA]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Edward Eustate Jimenez (1), Willianyi Almanzar Polanco (2). Violations of 21 U.S.C. §§ 841,846; 18 U.S.C. § 2. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein) (job) [1:24-mj-00851-UA]
Related: [-]
2 2 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Edward Eustate Jimenez. CJA, David Touger appointed counsel. Approved. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein) (job) [1:24-mj-00851-UA]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary Stein: Initial Appearance as to Edward Eustate Jimenez held on 2/27/2024. Detention Hearing as to Edward Eustate Jimenez held on 2/27/2024. AUSA Lisa Daniels present for the Government. Defendant present with attorney David Touger. BAIL DISPOSITION: Detention on consent w/o prejudice. ***Preliminary Hearing Date: 3/26/2024 on defendant's consent. (job) [1:24-mj-00851-UA]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Willianyi Almanzar Polanco. CJA, Lisa Scolari appointed counsel. Approved. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein) (job) [1:24-mj-00851-UA]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary Stein: Initial Appearance as to Willianyi Almanzar Polanco held on 2/27/2024. Detention Hearing as to Willianyi Almanzar Polanco held on 2/27/2024. AUSA Lisa Daniels present for the Government. Defendant present with attorney Lisa Scolari. BAIL DISPOSITION: $75,000 personal recognizance bond; To be co-signed by two financially responsible persons; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY; Surrender passport and no new applications; Pretrial supervision as directed by pretrial services; Drug testing/treatment as directed by pretrial services; Home detention; GPS; Def. to continue or seek employment; Maintain residence and not relocate without prior approval of pretrial services; No contact with co-defendant or other witnesses except in the presence of counsel; Def. to be detained until all conditions are met. ***Preliminary Hearing Date: 3/26/2024 on defendants consent. (job) [1:24-mj-00851-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
6 6 PRB Bond Entered as to Willianyi Almanzar Polanco in amount of $ $75,000. (jm) [1:24-mj-00851-UA]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
Case Designated ECF as to Edward Eustate Jimenez, Willianyi Almanzar Polanco. (jm)
Related: [-]
7 7 INDICTMENT FILED as to Edward Eustate Jimenez (1) count(s) 1, 2, Willianyi Almanzar Polanco (2) count(s) 1, 2. (jm)
Related: [-]