Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00060
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Mar 28, 2024 3:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Austin Engler (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David B. Mesrobian
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm*
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 4:07 AM EDT
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
1 1 3 pgs INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Austin Engler (1) count(s) 1. (BGR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted Indictment
2 2 1 pgs MOTION for Arrest Warrant by USA as to Austin Engler. (BGR)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ORDER granting 2 Motion for Arrest Warrant as to Austin Engler (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 3/27/2024. (BGR)
Related: [-]