In Re: Adam M. Wesolowski
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Leslie E Kobayashi |
Referred: | Rom Trader |
Case #: | 1:24-mc-00201 |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Thu 03/28 2:53 PM
ORDER PERMITTING PRACTICE re1 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 03/28/2024. Attorney Adam M. Wesolowski for United States of America added. (cgc) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Thu 03/28 8:18 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Miscellaneous case number MC 24-00201 LEK-RT on all further pleadings . (jni) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee/USA Applications
Wed 03/27 5:12 PM
Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee/USA Applications , filed by Adam M. Wesolowski.(Barbata, Dana) |