Massage by Denise Leslie Inc.
Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffery W Cavender |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-53178 |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Massage by Denise Leslie Inc.
6018 Kayron Dr
Atlanta, GA 30328-4110 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
362 Richard Russell Federal Building 75 Ted Turner Drive, SW
Atlanta, GA 30303 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
misc
Meeting of Creditors Held but Continued
Mon 04/22 2:56 PM
Section 341(a) meeting held but continued for production of additional documents or information. 341 Meeting to be held on 5/8/2024 at 11:00 AM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) (jar) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
misc
Hearing
Wed 04/17 7:54 AM
Rescheduled Hearing to be held on 5/14/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1203, Atlanta. (cws) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice
Sat 04/13 12:45 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 04/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
misc
0-Certificate of Service
Thu 04/11 12:36 PM
Certificate of Service of Debtor's Motion to Determine Extent of, and to Authorize Use of, Cash Collateral and Grant Adequate Protection, Motion for retroactive Authorization of Payment of Employees Wages Arising Prior to Entry of Order for Relief and Debtor's Motion to Allow Use of Pre-Petition Bank Accounts filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Massage by Denise Leslie Inc.. (Robl, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Leave of Absence
Thu 04/11 3:36 PM
Notice of Leave of Absence from May 24, 2024; May 27, 2024 - May 31, 2024; June 3, 2024 - June 7, 2024; June 10, 2024; and July 7, 2024 - July 12, 2024, filed by Michael D. Robl. (jar) |
|
22 | 22
misc
0-Certificate of Service
Wed 04/10 3:57 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service of Order Granting Debtors Motion to Set Expedited Hearing on First Day Motions and Notice of Hearing on Debtors First Day Motions filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Massage by Denise Leslie Inc.. (Robl, Michael) |
|
21 | 21
misc
0-Certificate of Service
Wed 04/10 3:55 PM
Certificate of Service of Order Granting Debtors Motion to Set Expedited Hearing on First Day Motions and Notice of Hearing on Debtors First Day Motions filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Massage by Denise Leslie Inc.. (Robl, Michael) |
|
20 | 20
4
pgs
notice
Order and Notice
Wed 04/10 3:00 PM
Order Granting Debtors Motion To Set Expedited Hearing On First Day Motions And Notice Of Hearing On Debtors First Day Motions. Service by Counsel and BNC. Hearing to be held on 4/16/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1203, Atlanta. [Review order for virtual hearing information.] Entered on 4/10/2024. (jlc) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Set Hearing, Motion to
Tue 04/09 3:06 PM
Emergency Motion to Set Hearing on Debtor's "First Day Motions" filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Massage by Denise Leslie Inc.. (Robl, Michael) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Authorize Use of Existing Bank Accounts, Motion to
Tue 04/09 2:00 PM
Motion to Authorize Use of Existing Bank Accounts filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Massage by Denise Leslie Inc.. (Robl, Michael) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Pay Pre-Petition Claims, Motion to
Tue 04/09 1:51 PM
Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Claims Motion for retroactive Authorization of Payment of Employees Wages Arising Prior to Entry of Order for Relief filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Massage by Denise Leslie Inc.. (Robl, Michael) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Approve Use of Cash Collateral, Motion to
Tue 04/09 11:49 AM
Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Massage by Denise Leslie Inc.. (Robl, Michael) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/08 7:01 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by BMW Financial Services NA, LLC. (Sharma, Amitkumar) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/08 7:00 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by BMW Financial Services NA, LLC. (Sharma, Amitkumar) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Small Business Cash-Flow Statement
Thu 04/04 1:23 PM
Small Business Cash-Flow Statement filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Massage by Denise Leslie Inc.. (Robl, Michael) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Small Business Statement of Operations
Thu 04/04 1:20 PM
Small Business Statement of Operations filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Massage by Denise Leslie Inc.. (Robl, Michael) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Small Business Balance Sheet
Thu 04/04 1:17 PM
Small Business Balance Sheet filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Massage by Denise Leslie Inc.. (Robl, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Small Business Federal Income Tax Return
Wed 04/03 11:34 AM
Small Business Federal Income Tax Return filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Massage by Denise Leslie Inc.. (Robl, Michael) |
|
Sunday, March 31, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees
Mon 04/01 12:47 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees Notice Date 03/31/2024. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual
Mon 04/01 12:47 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual. Notice Date 03/31/2024. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors
Mon 04/01 12:47 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/31/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
P-Corporate Resolution
Fri 03/29 4:23 PM
Corporate Resolution filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Massage by Denise Leslie Inc.. (Robl, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Regarding Unpaid Case Filing Fees
Fri 03/29 3:47 PM
Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fee in the Amount of $ 1,738.00 . Service by BNC. Entered on 3/29/2024. (cws) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual)
Fri 03/29 11:26 AM
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual). Service by BNC. Corporate Resolution due 4/11/2024. Tax Return Date: 4/4/2024. Balance Sheet Date: 4/4/2024.Statement of Operations Due 4/4/2024Cash Flow Statement due 4/4/2024 (cws) |
|
3 | 3
misc
03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11)
Fri 03/29 11:17 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 4/22/2024 at 10:00 AM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) Non-Government Proof of Claims due by 6/6/2024. Status Conference to be held on 5/22/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1203, Atlanta. (cws) |
|
misc
Deadline for Filing Pre-Status Conference Report
Fri 03/29 11:19 AM
Deadline: Pre-Status Conference Report Due By 5/8/2024. (cws) |
||
crditcrd
Autodocket of Credit Card
Fri 03/29 4:09 PM
Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-53178 ) [misc,4002aty] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A60796419. Fee Amount 1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
trustee
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee
Thu 03/28 4:58 PM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Gary M. Murphey filed by Trustee. (Kolba, Lindsay) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Verified Statement | ||
1 | 1
36
pgs
misc
Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 03/28 9:58 AM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Subchapter V Filed by Michael D. Robl of Robl Law Group LLC on behalf of Massage by Denise Leslie Inc.. Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Due by 06/26/2024. (Robl, Michael) |