California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 5:24-cv-01898
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2024
Terminated:Aug 05, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2024 1:17 AM PDT
Defendant
National Check Resolution, Inc.
Represented By
Gregory R Neidle
Dobbs & Neidle, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Adrian Torres
Represented By
Trinette Gragirena Kent
Lemberg Law, LLC
contact info

GPO Jun 05 2024
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/5/24. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/13/2024 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response or Dismissal due by 8/6/2024. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.(jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2024)

Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Friday, August 02, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 08/02 10:03 AM
ORDER granting 17 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/2/2024. (svklc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 08/02 7:33 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Adrian Torres.(Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Wed 06/05 10:43 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/5/24. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/13/2024 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response or Dismissal due by 8/6/2024. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/05 6:47 AM
NOTICE by Adrian Torres of Settlement (Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
14 14 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 05/22 8:48 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by National Check Resolution, Inc. and Corporate Disclosures (Neidle, Gregory)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 05/22 8:10 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Check Resolution, Inc... (Neidle, Gregory)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/22 7:57 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by National Check Resolution, Inc.. (Neidle, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
11 11 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/13 10:03 AM
ORDER granting 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Gregory R. Neidle). Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/13/2024. (svklc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/13 7:56 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Gregory R. Neidle ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19407146.) filed by National Check Resolution, Inc.. (Neidle, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/23 9:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adrian Torres. National Check Resolution, Inc. served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. (Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Tue 04/09 11:41 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING 7/2/24 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 7/9/24. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2024 is continued to 7/9/2024 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2024. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 06, 2024
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Sat 04/06 5:54 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adrian Torres.. (Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 03/29 1:57 PM
Summons Issued as to National Check Resolution, Inc. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 03/29 1:55 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2024 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 03/28 9:46 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/11/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 03/28 6:51 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Adrian Torres (Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 03/28 6:49 AM
Proposed Summons. (Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/28 6:48 AM
COMPLAINT against National Check Resolution, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19266700.). Filed by Adrian Torres.(Kent, Trinette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet