Johnson v. Secretary, Department of Corrections (Hillsborough County)
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas P Barber |
Referred: | Amanda Arnold Sansone |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00765 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 04/04 8:54 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KME) |
|
3 | 3
order
Judgment
Thu 04/04 8:52 AM
JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/4/2024. (KME) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 04/03 9:47 AM
ORDER dismissing petition for a writ of habeas corpus 1 without prejudice. A certificate of appealability is denied and Johnson is not entitled to appeal in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to enter a judgment against Johnson and close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 4/2/2024. (SRC) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 03/28 10:44 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Demetrius D. Johnson. (Filing Fee: Not Paid. No IFP Motion Filed.)(AA) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope |