9 Angelino Heights LLC
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Barry Russell |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-12375 |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
9 Angelino Heights LLC
801 E Edgeware Rd
Los Angeles, CA 90026-5127 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of motion/application
Fri 04/26 8:41 PM
Notice of motion/application Filed by Debtor 9 Angelino Heights LLC . (Langley, Christopher) |
|
15 | 15
motion
For Order Employing Professional (Ch 11)-(LBR 2014-1) (motion)
Fri 04/26 8:38 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion in Individual Ch 11 Case for Order Employing Professional (LBR 2014-1): Shioda Langley & Chang LLP as General Insolvency Counsel Filed by Debtor 9 Angelino Heights LLC (Langley, Christopher) |
|
14 | 14
court
Process Paid Request for Certified Copy
Fri 04/26 11:00 AM
|
|
13 | 13
misc
Request for a Certified Copy
Fri 04/26 9:53 AM
Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $12. The document will be sent via email to :chris@slclawoffice.com: Filed by Debtor 9 Angelino Heights LLC . (Langley, Christopher) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 04/26 9:53 AM
Receipt of Request for a Certified Copy([LINK:2:24-bk-12375-BR] ) [misc,paycert] ( 12.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56785403. Fee amount 12.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insi
Thu 04/04 1:03 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , Schedule A/B Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual:: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual:: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule F (Official Form B6F) - Creditors Holding Unsecured Nonpriority Claims , Schedule G Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual:: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) , Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual:: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders (Form 104 or 204) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Filed by Debtor 9 Angelino Heights LLC . (Langley, Christopher) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Mon 04/01 10:02 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Weber, Edward. (Weber, Edward) |
|
Sunday, March 31, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Sun 03/31 10:53 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Weber, Edward. (Weber, Edward) |
|
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sun 03/31 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/31/2024. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sun 03/31 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 03/31/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, March 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sat 03/30 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/30/2024. (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sat 03/30 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/30/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
court
Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Fri 03/29 12:28 PM
Hearing Set Status hearing to be held on 6/18/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF) |
|
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Fri 03/29 11:59 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/29/2024 at 10:00 AM at UST-LA2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-816-0394, PARTICIPANT CODE:5282999. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 6/28/2024. (LL2) |
|
3 | 3
6
pgs
order
Order setting initial status conference in chapter 11 case (BNC-PDF)
Fri 03/29 10:18 AM
Order setting initial status conference in chapter 11 case (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/29/2024. Status hearing to be held on 6/18/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Deficiency Notice (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (manual - def) (BNC)
Thu 03/28 10:58 AM
Notice of Case Deficiency Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 1007 (BNC) (SF) |
|
1 | 1
20
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 03/28 7:43 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by 9 Angelino Heights LLC Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 04/11/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 04/11/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 04/11/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 04/11/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 04/11/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 04/11/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 04/11/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 04/11/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 04/11/2024. (Langley, Christopher) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 03/28 7:46 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:24-bk-12375] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56667488. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco)
Thu 03/28 10:56 AM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 4/11/2024. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 4/11/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 4/11/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 4/11/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 4/11/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 4/11/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 4/11/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 4/11/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 4/11/2024. (SF) |