McFarland v. Beckett Air, Inc. et al.
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James S Gwin |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00574 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:12131 Americans with Disabilities |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 28, 2024 11:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Beckett Air, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Leah Dwight
|
|
Plaintiff
Justin McFarland
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
Fri 04/12 1:08 PM
Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/12/24 granting defendants'5 Motion for extension of time until May 13, 2024 to answer complaint . All Defendants. (T,A) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension (answer complaint)
Thu 04/11 9:37 AM
Motion for extension of time until May 13, 2024 to answer complaint filed by Beckett Air, Inc., Leah Dwight. (Turnbull, Tracey) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Return of Service Executed
Tue 04/09 8:30 AM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Leah Dwight on 4/3/2024, filed on behalf of Justin McFarland. Related document(s)2 . (L,Br) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Return of Service Executed
Fri 04/05 3:11 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Beckett Air, Inc. (and Registered Agent) on 4/3/2024, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Justin McFarland. Related document(s)2 . (L,Br) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
oth_evt
Service by Clerk
Mon 04/01 2:45 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Beckett Air, Inc. , Leah Dwight placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (L,Br) |
||
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Thu 03/28 10:55 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Beckett Air, Inc., Beckett Air, Inc. c/o Fauver Corporate Services, Inc. and Leah Dwight. (R,AP) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/28 10:26 AM
Complaint for damages and injunctive relief with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid, $405.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-12479870. Filed by Justin McFarland. (Brandt, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Thu 03/28 10:37 AM
Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (R,AP) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/28 10:38 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. (R,AP) |