Three Boudoir, LLC
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-12963 |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 30, 2024 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 06, 2024 |
Debtor
Three Boudoir, LLC
1150 NW 72nd Ave Ste 455 PMB 1612
Miami, FL 33126-1947 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Joel L Tabas
25 SE 2nd Avenue Suite 248
Miami, FL 33131 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 12:03 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Thu 03/28 11:00 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-12963 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A43980291. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]
Thu 03/28 9:33 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $338] (Kingcade, Timothy) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business Asset)
Thu 03/28 10:01 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Tabas, Joel L. Meeting of Creditors to be held by Video Conference on 4/30/2024 at 11:00 AM at www.Zoom.us - Tabas: Meeting ID 984 719 1469, Passcode 4203934839, Phone (786) 730-4327 Proofs of Claim due by 6/6/2024. (admin) |
|
3 | 3
attydoc
Disclosure of Compensation
Thu 03/28 11:10 AM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Timothy S Kingcade Esq. (Kingcade, Timothy) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Thu 03/28 11:11 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Three Boudoir, LLC. (Kingcade, Timothy) |