Kujak v. Minnesota, The State of
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Eric C Tostrud |
Referred: | Tony N Leung |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01092 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Report and Recommendation
Wed 04/17 12:42 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Prisoner Complaint,2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs,4 MOTION,5 MOTION, and7 MOTION filed by Jonathan Jerry Roman Kujak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/17/2024. (EB) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Sealed Motion (cv)
Fri 04/05 12:04 PM
MOTION of Discovery to Answer the Following Questions and Allowing the Plaintiff Access to the Confidential Information/Records filed by Jonathan Jerry Roman Kujak.(MMG) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Wed 04/03 9:54 AM
SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan Jerry Roman Kujak in SUPPORT OF4 MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION to SEAL1 Prisoner Complaint, MOTION for Return of Property MOTION to Compel,5 MOTION FOR ORDER filed by Jonathan Jerry Roman Kujak.(CLK) Document QC'd on 4/3/2024 (JME) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 03/28 9:33 AM
MOTION FOR ORDER filed by Jonathan Jerry Roman Kujak. (kt) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Discovery Temporary Restraining Order Dismiss/General Miscellaneous Relief Preliminary Injunction Permanent Injunction Seal Document under LR 5.6(e) Return of Property Compel
Thu 03/28 9:31 AM
(1) MOTION to for/at discovery, (2) MOTION to/for a rule 65.01 temporary injunction, (3) MOTION to/for a permanent discharge/dismissal of probation/parole, (4) MOTION to/for restore of all constitutional rights, (5) MOTION to/for a permanent release from custody, (6) MOTION to/for to move the temporary injunctions permanent upon closing of this case, (7) MOTION to/for a discovery/freedom of information act to discovery the information requested, (8) MOTION to/for to disclose the answers to the questions in the Freedom of Information Act, (9) MOTION to/for Conventional Seal this entire suit upon its case closing filed by Jonathan Jerry Roman Kujak. (kt) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Letter to Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/28 9:04 AM
LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jonathan Jerry Roman Kujak. (jam) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (IFP)
Thu 03/28 9:03 AM
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jonathan Jerry Roman Kujak.(jam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Prisoner Complaint under 42 USC 1983
Thu 03/28 9:02 AM
42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Minnesota, The State of filed by Jonathan Jerry Roman Kujak. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd, 4th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (jam) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |