Associated Builders and Contractors Florida First Coast Chapter et al v. General Services Administration et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy W Berger |
Referred: | Monte C Richardson |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00318 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 29:0151 Labor: Review of Agency Action |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 28, 2024 2:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Assistant Administrator for Procurement, National Aeronautics and Space Administration
|
|
Defendant
Director of Office of Management and Budget
|
|
Defendant
Director, Office of Government-Wide Acquisition Policy General Services Administration
|
|
Defendant
Far Council Chair, Senior Advisor to the Deputy Director for Management, Office of Federal Procurement Policy Office of Management and Budget
|
|
Defendant
Principal Director, Defense Pricing and Contracting, United States Department of Defense
|
|
Defendant
Senior Procurement Executive, General Services Administration
|
|
Plaintiff
Associated Builders and Contractors
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Associated Builders and Contractors Florida First Coast Chapter
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Fri 04/26 3:33 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Associated Builders and Contractors, Associated Builders and Contractors Florida First Coast Chapter.(Doud, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 15 | ||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons returned executed
Wed 04/24 4:43 PM
PROOF of service executed on April 4, 2024 by Associated Builders and Contractors, Associated Builders and Contractors Florida First Coast Chapter as to National Aeronautics and Space Administration. (Doud, Kimberly) Modified on 4/25/2024 to edit docket text (AJS). |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons returned executed
Wed 04/24 4:40 PM
PROOF of service executed on April 5, 2024 by Associated Builders and Contractors, Associated Builders and Contractors Florida First Coast Chapter as to United States Department of Defense. (Doud, Kimberly) Modified on 4/25/2024 to edit docket text (AJS). |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons returned executed
Wed 04/24 4:37 PM
PROOF of service executed on April 4, 2024 by Associated Builders and Contractors, Associated Builders and Contractors Florida First Coast Chapter as to General Services Administration(Jeffrey A. Koses, Senior Procurement Executive ). (Doud, Kimberly) Modified on 4/25/2024 to edit docket text (AJS). |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons returned executed
Wed 04/24 4:32 PM
PROOF of service executed on April 9, 2024 by Associated Builders and Contractors, Associated Builders and Contractors Florida First Coast Chapter as to Office of Management and Budget(Shalanda Young, Director). (Doud, Kimberly) Modified on 4/25/2024 to edit docket text (AJS). |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons returned executed
Wed 04/24 4:30 PM
PROOF of service executed on April 4, 2024 by Associated Builders and Contractors, Associated Builders and Contractors Florida First Coast Chapter as to General Services Administration(William F. Clark, Director, Office of Government-Wide Acquisition Policy). (Doud, Kimberly) Modified on 4/25/2024 to edit docket text (AJS). |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons returned executed
Wed 04/24 4:26 PM
PROOF of service executed on April 17, 2024 by Associated Builders and Contractors, Associated Builders and Contractors Florida First Coast Chapter as to Office of Management and Budget(Christine J. Harada, Far Council Chair, Senior Advisor to the Deputy Director for Management). (Doud, Kimberly) Modified on 4/25/2024 to edit docket text (AJS). |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 04/23 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 04/02 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kimberly J. Doud on behalf of Associated Builders and Contractors, Associated Builders and Contractors Florida First Coast Chapter. Lead Counsel: Kimberly J Doud. (Doud, Kimberly) Modified on 4/3/2024 to remove capitalization (ARL). |
|
9 | 9
order
Order
Tue 04/02 1:59 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/2/2024. (CKS) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons issued
Mon 04/01 3:40 PM
SUMMONS issued as to General Services Administration(William F. Clark, Director, Office of Government-Wide Acqusition Policy), General Services Administration(Jeffrey A. Koses, Senior Procurement Executive ), National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Office of Management and Budget(Shalanda Young, Director), Office of Management and Budget(Christine J. Harada, Far Council Chair, Senior Advisor to the Deputy Director for Management), United States Department of Defense. (ABM) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 03/28 1:13 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Kimberly J. Doud and Maurice Baskin of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 03/28 1:11 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Maurice Baskin Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS) |
|
5 | 5
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/28 1:01 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:24-cv-318-WWB-MCR. (AJS) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/28 12:58 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Associated Builders and Contractors, Associated Builders and Contractors Florida First Coast Chapter. (Doud, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/28 12:56 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS, ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS FLORIDA FIRST COAST CHAPTER,. (Doud, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
service
Proposed summons
Thu 03/28 12:19 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS, ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS FLORIDA FIRST COAST CHAPTER,. (Doud, Kimberly) |
|
1 | 1
48
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/28 11:57 AM
COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against CHRISTINE J. HARADA, FAR COUNCIL CHAIR, SENIOR ADVISOR TO THE DEPUTY DIRECTOR FOR MANAGEMENT, OFFICE OF FEDERAL PROCUREMENT POLICY, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET,, JEFFREY A. KOSES, SENIOR PROCUREMENT EXECUTIVE, GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, JOHN M. TENAGLIA, PRINCIPAL DIRECTOR, DEFENSE PRICING AND CONTRACTING, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, KARLA S. JACKSON, ASSISTANT ADMINISTRATOR FOR PROCUREMENT, NATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE, SHALANDA YOUNG, DIRECTOR OF OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, In their Official Capacities, WILLIAM F. CLARK, DIRECTOR, OFFICE OF GOVERNMENT-WIDE ACQUISITION POLICY, OFFICE OF ACQUISITION POLICY, OFFICE OF GOVERNMENT-WIDE POLICY, GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21920817) filed by ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS, ASSOCIATED BUILDERS AND CONTRACTORS FLORIDA FIRST COAST CHAPTER,.(Doud, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons William Clark, Office of Government-Wide, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Christine Harada - Office of Federal Procurement Policy, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Shalanda Young - Office of Management and Budget, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Karla Jackson - NASA Headquarters, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons John Tenaglia - Department of Defense |