Bouaddallah v. US Customs and Border Protection
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Marcia Morales Howard |
Referred: | Monte C Richardson |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00321 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 18:983 Civil Forfeiture Proceedings |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 28, 2024 2:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
US Customs and Border Protection
|
|
Plaintiff
Richard Bouaddallah
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 04/24 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JTM) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 04/22 12:02 PM
ORDER granting 6 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Complaint. This case is dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/22/2024. (JW) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Fri 04/19 3:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Richard Bouaddallah. (Sammis, Leslie) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons issued
Fri 03/29 12:14 PM
SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection. (JDR) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 03/29 8:09 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Proposed summons
Thu 03/28 3:29 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Richard Bouaddallah. (Sammis, Leslie) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/28 2:31 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:24-cv-321-MMH-MCR. (RLK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/28 2:11 PM
COMPLAINT for Return of Property against Richard Bouaddallah with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21921680) filed by Richard Bouaddallah.(Sammis, Leslie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Seizure, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |