McDonald v. Incharge Debt Solutions, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John Antoon II |
Referred: | Daniel C Irick |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00597 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 28, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Incharge Debt Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Diamond M. McDonald
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons returned executed
Mon 04/22 10:51 AM
RETURN of service executed on 4/18/2024 by Diamond M. McDonald as to Incharge Debt Solutions, Inc. (Taylor, Alexander) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/11 4:03 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Diamond M. McDonald. (Taylor, Alexander) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/11 10:59 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a Disclosure Statement no later than April 18, 2024. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/11/2024. (EK) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/01 1:01 PM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program
Mon 04/01 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (TNP) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Interested Persons Order
Fri 03/29 2:12 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 7 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/29/2024. (KLD) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Fri 03/29 9:48 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Incharge Debt Solutions, Inc. (ARL) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/28 2:11 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-597-JA-DCI. (RLK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/28 12:26 PM
COMPLAINT against Incharge Debt Solutions, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21921166) filed by Diamond M. McDonald.(Taylor, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |