Cantin et al v. Ingham County et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Paul L Maloney |
Referred: | Phillip J Green |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00322 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal-Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Ingham County Circuit, 24-00173-CZ |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 28, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
defendant
Alan Fox
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Ingham, County of
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Eric Schertzing
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Anthony Cantin
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Athel Curtis
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Michael Freeman
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Susan Freeman
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Brent Maffett
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Clyde Zeigler
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Gordon Zeigler
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Stipulation and Order
Tue 04/16 11:22 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendants to file response to complaint extended to 5/8/2024; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proposed Order
Mon 04/15 3:55 PM
PROPOSED ORDER regarding Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by defendants Alan Fox, Ingham, County of, Eric Schertzing (Shenouda, Magy) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Wed 04/10 2:04 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Donald R. Visser on behalf of plaintiffs Anthony Cantin, Athel Curtis, Michael Freeman, Susan Freeman, Brent Maffett, Clyde Zeigler, Gordon Zeigler (Visser, Donald) |
||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Wed 04/10 2:05 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel O. Myers on behalf of plaintiffs Anthony Cantin, Athel Curtis, Michael Freeman, Susan Freeman, Brent Maffett, Clyde Zeigler, Gordon Zeigler (Myers, Daniel) |
||
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Mon 04/01 8:53 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Paul L. Maloney (ems) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/28 11:18 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Defendants from Ingham County Circuit case number 24-173-CZ filed by Ingham County, Eric Schertzing, Alan Fox (Shenouda, Magy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint | ||
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Thu 03/28 11:32 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by defendants Alan Fox, Ingham County, Eric Schertzing in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7332447 (Shenouda, Magy) |
||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 03/28 1:16 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Charles Allen Lawler on behalf of defendants Alan Fox, Ingham, County of, Eric Schertzing (Lawler, Charles) |
||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 03/28 1:22 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Donald R. Visser on behalf of plaintiffs Anthony Cantin, Athel Curtis, Michael Freeman, Susan Freeman, Brent Maffett, Clyde Zeigler, Gordon Zeigler (Visser, Donald) |
||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 03/28 1:23 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Donovan James Visser on behalf of plaintiffs Anthony Cantin, Athel Curtis, Michael Freeman, Susan Freeman, Brent Maffett, Clyde Zeigler, Gordon Zeigler (Visser, Donovan) |