Meyer v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Carmen E Henderson |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00576 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Magistrate Judges Initial Order
Fri 03/29 4:04 PM
Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 3/29/2024. (S,KL) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis
Fri 03/29 4:03 PM
Order granting the Plaintiff's2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 3/29/2024. (S,KL) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Consent to Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/28 2:40 PM
Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson for further proceedings. Judge David A. Ruiz on 3/28/2024. (G,CA) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (atty event)
Thu 03/28 1:54 PM
Notice of Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Kim Meyer. (Margolius, Marcia) |
|
3 | 3
order
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order
Thu 03/28 1:36 PM
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Sara Lioi. (F,AW) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/28 12:21 PM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Kim Meyer. Related document(s)1 . (Margolius, Marcia) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/28 12:20 PM
Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Kim Meyer. (Margolius, Marcia) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Thu 03/28 1:35 PM
Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (F,AW) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/28 1:35 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (F,AW) |
||
oth_evt
Notice of Social Security Complaint
Thu 03/28 1:36 PM
Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (F,AW) |
||
order
Automatic Reference of Administrative Action
Thu 03/28 1:37 PM
Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. (F,AW) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Thu 03/28 2:46 PM
Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson assigned to case pursuant to consent. Judge David A. Ruiz terminated. Related document5 . (H,Ch) |