BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC.
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Hilary L Barnes |
Case #: | 3:24-bk-50300 |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 06, 2024 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 06, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC.
1615 MARIETTA WAY
RENO, NV 89510 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
CHAPTER 11 - RN
300 BOOTH STREET, STE 3009
RENO, NV 89509 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 11
300 BOOTH STREET, STE 3009
RENO, NV 89509 |
Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
45 | 45
answer
Reply
Thu 04/25 10:20 AM
Reply Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
answer
Objection
Mon 04/22 3:24 PM
Limited Objection and Response to Debtor's Motion for Interim Approval to Use Cash Collateral with Certificate of Service Filed by TIMOTHY A LUKAS on behalf of ZIONS BANCORPORATION, N.A. DBA NEVADA STATE BANK (LUKAS, TIMOTHY) |
|
43 | 43
notice
Notice (BK)
Mon 04/22 12:17 PM
Notice OF SUBPOENA TO ZIONS BANCORPORATION, N.A. DBA NEVADA STATE BANK Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
42 | 42
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/22 10:49 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
41 | 41
misc
Change of Address (BK)
Mon 04/22 10:33 AM
Change of Address of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
40 | 40
misc
Voluntary Petition (Amended)
Mon 04/22 10:30 AM
Amended Voluntary Petition. Item(s) Amended: Address. 500 SERENITY PLACE, RENO, NV 89510 Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Entry of Order (BK)
Thu 04/18 2:50 PM
Notice of Entry of Order Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Notice of Appearance (BK)
Wed 04/17 3:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Special Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by SETH J. ADAMS on behalf of WOODBURN AND WEDGE (ADAMS, SETH) |
|
37 | 37
order
Examination (BK)
Wed 04/17 1:53 PM
Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination (mmm) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Examination (2004) (BK)
Tue 04/16 4:57 PM
Ex Parte Motion for 2004 Examination with Proposed Order Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/15 9:30 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Hearing (BK)
Mon 04/15 9:23 AM
Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 04/30/2024 Hearing Time: 2:30 p.m. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
33 | 33
order
Shortening Time (Bk)
Mon 04/15 8:50 AM
Order Granting Motion for Order Shortening Time . Hearing scheduled 4/30/2024 at 02:30 PM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. (mmm) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
court
Text Only Entry (Deficiency)
Fri 04/12 10:22 AM
Text Only Entry (Deficiency) PDF reflects an incorrect BK and or Adv case number. (mmm) |
|
31 | 31
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (BK)
Fri 04/12 10:15 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled.Hearing scheduled 6/12/2024 at 02:30 PM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. (mmm) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/11 2:28 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Attorney Information Sheet (Bk)
Thu 04/11 1:52 PM
Attorney Information Sheet Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Declaration (BK)
Thu 04/11 1:51 PM
Declaration Of: KEVIN A. DARBY, ESQ. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
27 | 27
2
pgs
motion
Order Shortening Time (Bk)
Thu 04/11 1:50 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Order Shortening Time Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Hearing (BK)
Thu 04/11 1:25 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 06/12/2024 Hearing Time: 2:30 p.m. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Declaration (BK)
Thu 04/11 1:10 PM
Declaration Of: MARTIN W. BREITMEYER III Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Use Cash Collateral
Thu 04/11 1:09 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral with Proposed Order Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
23 | 23
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Thu 04/11 12:48 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Schedules/Declaration Re Schedules([LINK 24-50300 hlb] ) [misc,amdschs1] ( 34.00). Receipt number A21722104, fee amount $ 34.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Schedules/Declaration Re Schedules
Thu 04/11 12:47 PM
Amended Non-Individual Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule[s] E/F, Creditors Holding Unsecured Priority Claims Amount: $ 56731.77, Creditors Holding Unsecured Nonpriority claims Amount: $ 212405.15, Fee Amount $34, Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Wed 04/10 12:22 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Schedules/Declaration Re Schedules([LINK 24-50300 hlb] ) [misc,amdschs1] ( 34.00). Receipt number A21716543, fee amount $ 34.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Schedules/Declaration Re Schedules
Wed 04/10 12:22 PM
Non-Individual Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule[s] A/B, Real Property Amount: $ 0, Personal Property Amount: $ 328331.84, C, Amount $0.00, D, Creditors Holding Secured Claims Amount: $ 933132.4, E/F, Creditors Holding Unsecured Priority Claims Amount: $ 56731.77, Creditors Holding Unsecured Nonpriority claims Amount: $ 167435.15, G, H, Declaration Concerning Debtor[s] Schedules, Fee Amount $34, , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Declaration (BK)
Wed 04/10 12:14 PM
Declaration Of: KEVIN A. DARBY, ESQ. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
18 | 18
9
pgs
motion
Employ (BK)
Wed 04/10 12:14 PM
Application to Employ DARBY LAW PRACTICE, LTD as REORGANIZATION COUNSEL FOR DEBTOR with Proposed Order Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Tax Documents
Wed 04/10 11:50 AM
Amended Tax Documents for the Year for 2021 . This document contains sensitive information and cannot be viewed by the public. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Balance Sheet
Tue 04/09 4:11 PM
Balance Sheet , Statement of Operations for Small Business , Cash Flow Statement for Small Business Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Tax Documents
Thu 04/04 10:50 AM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2022 . This document contains sensitive information and cannot be viewed by the public. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
utility
Add Trustee
Wed 04/03 11:48 AM
EDWARD M. BURR added to case, Terminated Trustee CHAPTER 11 - RN (mmm) |
||
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Notice of Appearance (BK)
Tue 04/02 12:09 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by TIMOTHY A LUKAS on behalf of ZIONS BANCORPORATION, N.A. DBA NEVADA STATE BANK (LUKAS, TIMOTHY) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
trustee
Appointment of Trustee
Tue 04/02 10:24 AM
Appointment of Trustee Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee and Verified Statement . (DIDION, TERRI) |
|
Sunday, March 31, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sun 03/31 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 44. Notice Date 03/31/2024. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sun 03/31 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/31/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, March 30, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 03/30 9:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 33. Notice Date 03/30/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Notice of Appearance (BK)
Fri 03/29 12:22 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by CARLOS R. HERNANDEZ-VIVONI on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 11 (HERNANDEZ-VIVONI, CARLOS) |
|
8 | 8
order
Set Hearing (BK)
Fri 03/29 11:38 AM
Order to Set Hearing. Status Hearing to be held on 6/12/2024 at 02:30 PM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. Pre-Status Report Due By 5/29/2024. (dcl) |
|
7 | 7
court
Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 11 Non-Individual (BNC)
Fri 03/29 10:50 AM
Notice of Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing. (dcl) |
|
6 | 6
utility
Set Deficient Filing Deadlines-11
Fri 03/29 10:47 AM
Set Deficient Filing Deadlines. Incomplete Filings due by 4/12/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due by 4/12/2024. Schedule A/B due by 4/12/2024. Schedule D due by 4/12/2024.Schedule E/F due by 4/12/2024. Schedule G due by 4/12/2024. Schedule H due by 4/12/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury due by 4/12/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due by 4/12/2024. (dcl) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Resolution of Board of Directors
Thu 03/28 12:38 PM
Resolution of Board of Directors Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Non-Individual (BNC-auto assignment)
Thu 03/28 11:02 AM
|
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Thu 03/28 11:01 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-50300 ) [misc,volp11pb] (1738.00). Receipt number A21683407, fee amount $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Thu 03/28 10:58 AM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
1 | 1
17
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11
Thu 03/28 10:57 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of BREITMEYER FABRICATIONS, INC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 06/26/2024. (DARBY, KEVIN) |