10
|
|
10
motion
05-Motion to Dismiss Case (FOR OTHER)
Mon 04/01 6:44 AM
Motion to Dismiss Case filed by David S. Weidenbaum on behalf of United States Trustee. Hearing to be held on 4/30/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1404, Atlanta. (Weidenbaum, David)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual
Mon 04/01 12:47 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual. Notice Date 03/31/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding List of Creditors
Mon 04/01 12:47 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding List of Creditors Notice Date 03/31/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors
Mon 04/01 12:47 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/31/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual)
Fri 03/29 8:42 AM
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual). Service by BNC. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/11/2024. Schedule(s) A/B, D, E/F, G, and H due by 4/11/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury due by 4/11/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 4/11/2024. Corporate Resolution due 4/11/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/11/2024. Tax Return Date: 4/4/2024. Balance Sheet Date: 4/4/2024.Statement of Operations Due 4/4/2024Cash Flow Statement due 4/4/2024 (cws)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
1
pgs
order
Order Regarding List of Creditors
Fri 03/29 8:38 AM
Order Regarding the List of Creditors with deficiencies noted. Failure to comply will result in dismissal of case without further notice. Service by BNC. List of all creditors due 4/5/2024. Entered on 3/29/2024. (cws)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
misc
03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11)
Fri 03/29 8:37 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 4/29/2024 at 09:00 AM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) (cws)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/29 7:43 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by David S. Weidenbaum on behalf of United States Trustee. (Weidenbaum, David)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
P-Twenty (20) Largest Unsecured Creditors
Thu 03/28 4:02 PM
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors filed by Ohoopee Shoals, LLC . (hd)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
misc
Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 03/28 2:37 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Filed by Ohoopee Shoals, LLC . Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 9/24/2024., Disclosure Statement due by 9/24/2024. (rfs)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Autodocket of Installment Receipt - Intake
Thu 03/28 10:45 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Installment Filing Fee - $1,738.00 by RS. Receipt Number 10001853. Paid by Ohoopee Shoals, LLC. (acr)
Related: [-]
|