Simha v. Mayo Clinic
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | John R Tunheim |
Referred: | David T Schultz |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01097 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 28, 2024 2:11 PM CDT |
Defendant
Mayo Clinic
200 1st Street SW
Rochester, MN 55905 |
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Simha
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings)
Tue 04/16 11:22 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Brandon Thompson Affidavit of Expert Review byMichelle Simha. (Thompson, Brandon) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/02 2:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Michelle Simha. Mayo Clinic waiver sent on 3/29/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. (Thompson, Brandon) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/02 12:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J Ebnet on behalf of Mayo Clinic. (Ebnet, Nathan) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/02 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B Brantingham on behalf of Mayo Clinic. (Brantingham, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/28 1:46 PM
Summons Issued as to Mayo Clinic. (ACH) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 03/28 1:46 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-1097 JRT/DTS. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/28 1:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Mayo Clinic (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10936693) filed by Michelle Simha. Filer requests summons issued. (Thompson, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |