New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Case #: 2:24-cv-02302
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2024 4:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Edward Bonahue
Represented By
Matthew J. Mehnert
Guercio & Guercio, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Suffolk County Community College
Represented By
Matthew J. Mehnert
Guercio & Guercio, LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Board of Trustees of Suffolk County Community College
Represented By
Matthew J. Mehnert
Guercio & Guercio, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Donna Ciampa
Represented By
Paul F. Millus
Meyer Suozzi English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sylvia Diaz
Represented By
Paul F. Millus
Meyer Suozzi English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
P. Wesly Lundburg
Represented By
Paul F. Millus
Meyer Suozzi English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alicia O'Connor
Represented By
Paul F. Millus
Meyer Suozzi English & Klein, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, August 23, 2024
19 19 respoth Reply in Support Fri 08/23 3:25 PM
REPLY in Support re17 MOTION to Dismiss in part filed by Edward Bonahue, Suffolk County Community College, The Board of Trustees of Suffolk County Community College. (Mehnert, Matthew)
Related: [-]
18 18 12 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Fri 08/23 3:24 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss in part filed by Edward Bonahue, Suffolk County Community College, The Board of Trustees of Suffolk County Community College. (Mehnert, Matthew)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss Fri 08/23 3:23 PM
MOTION to Dismiss in part by Edward Bonahue, Suffolk County Community College, The Board of Trustees of Suffolk County Community College. (Mehnert, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Memorandum in Support
Friday, August 02, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Fri 08/02 2:59 PM
Letter Reflecting Service of Opposition Papers by Donna Ciampa, Sylvia Diaz, P. Wesly Lundburg, Alicia O'Connor (Millus, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 07/16 4:30 PM
ORDER. The Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, ECF No.15 , is GRANTED. The Plaintiff shall serve its opposition by August 2, 2024 . The Defendants shall serve their reply, and file the bundled motion by August 23, 2024 . Ordered by Judge Nusrat J. Choudhury on 7/16/2024. (ASB)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 07/15 12:33 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Donna Ciampa, Sylvia Diaz, P. Wesly Lundburg, Alicia O'Connor. (Millus, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
14 14 misc Letter Wed 07/03 10:37 AM
Letter Reflecting Service of Motion Papers by Edward Bonahue, Suffolk County Community College, The Board of Trustees of Suffolk County Community College (Mehnert, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Thu 05/30 8:31 PM
ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Defendant's pre-motion conference request on their anticipated motion to dismiss the Complaint, ECF No.12 . The Court finds that a pre-motion conference is not necessary at this time and waives the pre-motion conference requirement. The parties shall comply with the attached briefing schedule. Consequently, all briefing shall be filed with the Court no later than August 1, 2024 . Ordered by Judge Nusrat J. Choudhury on 5/30/2024. (ASB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - Declined Wed 05/29 11:55 AM
NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. (CT)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/29 12:01 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Nusrat Jahan Choudhury and Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
12 12 motion Pre Motion Conference Tue 05/28 2:34 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference re1 Complaint,,, Seeking Permission to File Motion to Dismiss by Edward Bonahue, Suffolk County Community College, The Board of Trustees of Suffolk County Community College. (Mehnert, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/07 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Mehnert on behalf of Edward Bonahue, Suffolk County Community College, The Board of Trustees of Suffolk County Community College (aty to be noticed) (Mehnert, Matthew)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Acknowledgment of Service Tue 05/07 3:04 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to1 Complaint,,, Acknowledgement filed by Edward Bonahue, Suffolk County Community College, The Board of Trustees of Suffolk County Community College. (Mehnert, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 03/29 10:17 AM
Summons Issued as to The Board of Trustees of Suffolk County Community College. (IL)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 03/29 10:16 AM
Summons Issued as to Suffolk County Community College. (IL)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 03/29 10:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Edward Bonahue. (IL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
6 6 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/28 5:01 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,,, by Donna Ciampa, Sylvia Diaz, P. Wesly Lundburg, Alicia O'Connor (Millus, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/28 5:00 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,,, by Donna Ciampa, Sylvia Diaz, P. Wesly Lundburg, Alicia O'Connor (Millus, Paul)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/28 4:59 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,,, by Donna Ciampa, Sylvia Diaz, P. Wesly Lundburg, Alicia O'Connor (Millus, Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Thu 03/28 4:10 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (LJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 03/28 4:06 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/28 4:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendants Suffolk County Community College, The Board of Trustees of Suffolk County Community College and Edward Bonahue, President of Suffolk County Community College against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Alicia O'Connor, Donna Ciampa, P. Wesly Lundburg, Sylvia Diaz. (LJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Suffolk County Community College Exempt Salary and Benefit Plan,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - 2014-2015 Salary Schedule,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Suffolk County Community College,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons The Board of Trustees of Suffolk County Community College,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons Edward Bonahue, President of Suffolk County Community College
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 03/28 4:02 PM
FILING FEE: $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17718048 (LJ)
Related: [-]
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Thu 03/28 4:04 PM
Incorrect Document Entry Information. Complaint was entered as against all plaintiffs; entry was deleted and re-entered as against all defendants. (LJ)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/28 4:08 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Thu 03/28 4:11 PM
Your proposed summonses were not issued for the following reason: The full case caption as it appears on the complaint must appear on the summons. Please correct and resubmit using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (LJ)
Related: [-]