Bucklin v. Bank of America, N.A.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John L Badalamenti |
Referred: | Nicholas P Mizell |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00278 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit, 11-02024-CA-000443 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 28, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynne M. Bucklin
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 9:25 AM
ORDER granting 16 motion for special admission of attorney Pumphrey. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/25/2024. (JMM) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 6:30 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Brian E. Pumphrey to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22020986 for $150 by Bank of America, N.A.. (Mydock, Kimberly) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/23 6:14 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document: 4 Complaintfiled by Lynne M. Bucklin.(Carollo, Bernard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Assignment of Claims, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - BOA Claim Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - BOA Security Center, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - BOA How to Avoid Scams, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Composite E - BOA Elder Financial Care, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - BOA Private Bank 1, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - BOA Private Bank 2, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - BOA Private Bank 3 | ||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 04/05 12:49 PM
NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties to file a Case Management Report by 5/20/2024. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 24278. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 04/05 10:08 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 10 , 11 defendant's unopposed motions for extension of time to respond to the complaint. Defendant has since responded to the complaint (Doc. 12 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/5/2024. (JMM) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss
Thu 04/04 7:52 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Partially Unopposed) by Bank of America, N.A..(Mydock, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - New Hampshire Circuit Court Order Dated May 4, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Thu 04/04 4:50 PM
Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re4 Complaint Following Anticipated Amendment of Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.. (Mydock, Kimberly) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Thu 04/04 3:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re4 Complaint Following Anticipated Amendment of Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.. (Mydock, Kimberly) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/03 5:15 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America, N.A... (Mydock, Kimberly) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 04/03 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kimberly Tolland Mydock on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. Lead Counsel: Kimberly Tolland Mydock. (Mydock, Kimberly) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/01 3:49 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Lynne M. Bucklin. (Carollo, Bernard) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Mon 04/01 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Bernard Charles Carollo, Jr on behalf of Lynne M. Bucklin. Lead Counsel: Bernard C. Carollo, Jr.. (Carollo, Bernard) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Civil Action Order
Fri 03/29 2:07 PM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/29/2024. (WRW) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/29 10:49 AM
COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A. with Jury Demand filed by Lynne M. Bucklin. (Originally filed in State Court on 2/23/2024)(BGR) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 03/29 9:34 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/29 9:33 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:24-cv-278-JLB-NPM. (AJS) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/28 3:49 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Collier County Circuit Court, case number 11-2024-CA-000443-0001 filed in State Court on February 23, 2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21922809 filed by Bank of America, N.A..(Mydock, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Other Documents Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court, | ||
Att: 4 State Court Docket Sheet Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet |