Ariza v. Bigfoot Axe Throwers LLC
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy W Berger |
Referred: | Daniel C Irick |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00599 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 28, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Bigfoot Axe Throwers LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Victor Ariza
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/16 9:51 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Victor Ariza. (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Answer to court interrogatories
Tue 04/02 4:13 PM
ANSWER to court interrogatories re:6 Order setting status conference by Victor Ariza.(Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Mon 04/01 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Roderick Victor Hannah on behalf of Victor Ariza. Lead Counsel: RODERICK V. HANNAH, ESQ.. (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
7
pgs
order
Order setting status conference
Fri 03/29 10:56 AM
ADA SCHEDULING ORDER. Status Conference set for 10/8/2024 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/29/2024. (RMF) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order
Fri 03/29 10:38 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/29/2024. (RMF) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 03/29 9:08 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Pelayo M. Duran, Roderick Victor Hannah of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EAM) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Fri 03/29 9:07 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Bigfoot Axe Throwers LLC. (EAM) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/28 3:57 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-599-WWB-DCI. (RLK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/28 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Bigfoot Axe Throwers LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21922254) filed by Victor Ariza.(Duran, Pelayo) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |