Crean v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Steven D Merryday |
Referred: | Amanda Arnold Sansone |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00775 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 28, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
James Crean
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/24 5:32 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Equifax Information Services, LLC's unopposed motion (Doc. 16 ) to extend the time within which to respond to the complaint is GRANTED. No later than MAY 14, 2024, Equifax must respond. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/24/2024. (WBW) |
|
23 | 23
answer
Answer to amended complaint
Wed 04/24 4:03 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 9 Amended Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Joffe, Jason) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 4:51 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Ruiz, Maria) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Fri 04/19 4:47 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Ruiz, Maria) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Fri 04/19 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Maria Helena Ruiz on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Maria H. Ruiz. (Ruiz, Maria) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation
Fri 04/19 4:44 PM
STIPULATION re9 Amended Complaint / Stipulation Of Acceptance Of Service Of Amended Complaint And Rule 15(A)(3) Response Deadline by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Ruiz, Maria) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Fri 04/19 8:47 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Related case(s): No (Joffe, Jason) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 8:46 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Joffe, Jason) Modified to edit docket text on 4/19/2024 (EVK) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Fri 04/19 8:45 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re9 Amended Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Joffe, Jason) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Fri 04/19 8:44 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jason Daniel Joffe on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. Lead Counsel: Jason Daniel Joffe. (Joffe, Jason) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons returned executed
Thu 04/18 2:37 PM
RETURN of service executed on 04.08.24 by James Crean as to Trans Union LLC. (Dubbeld, Jon) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons returned executed
Fri 04/05 4:10 PM
RETURN of service executed on 04.01.24 by James Crean as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Dubbeld, Jon) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons returned executed
Fri 04/05 4:09 PM
RETURN of service executed on 04.01.24 by James Crean as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Dubbeld, Jon) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons issued
Thu 04/04 2:28 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Trans Union LLC. (JTM) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Proposed summons
Tue 04/02 11:13 AM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by James Crean. (Dubbeld, Jon) |
|
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/02 11:13 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union LLC with Jury Demand. filed by James Crean.(Dubbeld, Jon) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program
Fri 03/29 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (ABC) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/29 11:02 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by James Crean. (Dubbeld, Jon) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Fri 03/29 11:01 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by James Crean. Related case(s): No (Dubbeld, Jon) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Fri 03/29 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jon Paul Dubbeld on behalf of James Crean. Lead Counsel: Jon P. Dubbeld. (Dubbeld, Jon) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 03/29 8:18 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Fri 03/29 8:18 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (JK) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/28 4:01 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:24-cv-775-SDM-AAS. (RLK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/28 3:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21922498) filed by James Crean.(Dubbeld, Jon) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons |